EP3051473 - QUEUE TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR Corporation 864 Spring St. NW Atlanta, GA 30308-1007 / US | [2018/20] |
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states NCR Corporation 3097 Satellite Blvd. Duluth, GA 30096 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yepez, Rafael 4000 Spring Cove Drive Duluth, GA 30097 / US | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Secerna LLP The Old Fire Station 18 Clifford Street York YO1 9RD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | MacLeod, Roderick William NCR Limited Intellectual Property Section Discovery Centre 3 Fulton Road Dundee Tayside, DD2 4SW / GB | Application number, filing date | 15194828.8 | 16.11.2015 | [2016/31] | Priority number, date | US201514606168 | 27.01.2015 Original published format: US201514606168 | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3051473 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G06Q10/06 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
G06Q10/063114 (EP,US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2016/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WARTESCHLANGENTECHNIKEN | [2016/31] | English: | QUEUE TECHNIQUES | [2016/31] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE FILE D'ATTENTE | [2016/31] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/26] | 22.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.10.2019 | 01.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012158934 (XIAO HONG [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0086] *; | [X]US2003083045 (BLIGHT DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0107] * |