EP3026925 - IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS AND INFORMATION PROVIDING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/21] |
Former [2016/22] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, In-jee 101-211, 23, Siheung-daero 77-gil, Geumcheon-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Seung-min 108-1003, 750, Geumha-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
LEE, Yong-hoon 115-1002, 80, Dongbaekjukjeon-daero 527beon-gil Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2016/22] | Application number, filing date | 15195468.2 | 19.11.2015 | [2016/22] | Priority number, date | KR20140168956 | 28.11.2014 Original published format: KR 20140168956 | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3026925 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3026925 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/44, H04N21/4722, G06F16/58 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
H04N21/43 (CN,KR);
G06F16/58 (US);
G06F8/38 (KR);
G09G5/12 (US);
G09G5/377 (US);
H04N21/20 (KR);
H04N21/23 (KR);
H04N21/4302 (KR);
H04N21/431 (CN);
H04N21/45 (KR);
H04N21/4722 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/22] | H04N21/4722, H04N21/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2016/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSBEREITSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/22] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS AND INFORMATION PROVIDING METHOD THEREOF | [2016/22] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ POUR FOURNIR DES INFORMATIONS | [2016/22] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/34] | 08.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.11.2019 | 28.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2015 | AL | 26.05.2021 | AT | 26.05.2021 | CY | 26.05.2021 | CZ | 26.05.2021 | DK | 26.05.2021 | EE | 26.05.2021 | ES | 26.05.2021 | FI | 26.05.2021 | HR | 26.05.2021 | IT | 26.05.2021 | LT | 26.05.2021 | LV | 26.05.2021 | MC | 26.05.2021 | MK | 26.05.2021 | NL | 26.05.2021 | PL | 26.05.2021 | RO | 26.05.2021 | RS | 26.05.2021 | SE | 26.05.2021 | SI | 26.05.2021 | SK | 26.05.2021 | SM | 26.05.2021 | BG | 26.08.2021 | NO | 26.08.2021 | GR | 27.08.2021 | IS | 26.09.2021 | PT | 27.09.2021 | IE | 19.11.2021 | LU | 19.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | FR | 30.11.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 19.11.2015 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.11.2021 | ||
LU | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 19.11.2015 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.11.2021 | ||
LU | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.11.2021 | ||
LU | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.11.2021 | ||
LU | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008204595 (RATHOD PRIYANG [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0134]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]WO2008140270 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0101]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP2523466 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0045]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO2014151883 (GOOGLE INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0098]; figure 4 * | Examination | - TOMOHIKO TAKAHASHI KDDI JAPAN, "Consent - Draft recommendation ITU-T J.301 (J.arstv-req) ?Requirements of Augmented Reality Smart Television System?;TD571 Rev.1(GEN/9)", ITU-T DRAFT ; STUDY PERIOD 2013-2016, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20140911), vol. 10/9, pages 1 - 13, XP044094687 |