EP3170757 - A CLEANING UNIT FOR CLEANING PACKS IN A PACKAGING MACHINE, A PACKAGING MACHINE AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING PACKAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance S.A. Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLETTI, Gabriele Via Marco Polo, 19 41012 Carpi / IT | 02 /
MALAVASI, Filippo Strada Formigina, 78/3 41126 Modena / IT | 03 /
SERENI, Alessandro Via Boninsegni, 18 41043 Formigine / IT | 04 /
SORBARA, Angelo Via Alessandro Volta, 7 42048 Rubiera (RE) / IT | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 22186 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 15195791.7 | 23.11.2015 | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3170757 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65B55/24, B65B57/02, B65B61/28, B65B61/18, B65B61/24 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
B65B55/24 (EP);
B65B57/02 (EP);
B65B61/24 (EP);
B65B61/28 (EP);
B65B61/186 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSEINHEIT ZUM REINIGEN VON PACKUNGEN IN EINER VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE, VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON PACKUNGEN | [2017/21] | English: | A CLEANING UNIT FOR CLEANING PACKS IN A PACKAGING MACHINE, A PACKAGING MACHINE AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING PACKAGES | [2017/21] | French: | UNITÉ DE NETTOYAGE POUR LE NETTOYAGE DE PAQUETS DANS UNE MACHINE D'EMBALLAGE, MACHINE D'EMBALLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'EMBALLAGES | [2017/21] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2001029972 (KAJIURA MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8 * the whole document * [Y] 14,15; | [XY]WO0119717 (SEARLE MATTHEW JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 14,15; | [X]WO2007083398 (SUNTORY LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,9-13 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9928193 (LOSCHI SERGIO [IT], et al) [X] 1,3,9-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US5195298 (BARANOWSKI JOHN [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2012055116 (NEIHEISER KATHRYN JEANNE [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2586715 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [A] 7 * the whole document * |