EP3026260 - METHODS OF MANUFACTURING ROTOR BLADE COMPONENTS FOR A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARUSO, Christopher Daniel 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 02 /
YARBROUGH, Aaron A. 300 Garlington Road Greenville, NY New York 29615 / US | 03 /
GEIGER, Shannon B. 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15195885.7 | 23.11.2015 | [2016/22] | Priority number, date | US201414552517 | 25.11.2014 Original published format: US201414552517 | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3026260 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06, B29C70/52, B32B5/08, B29D99/00, B29C43/18 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
B29C70/34 (CN);
B29C65/48 (US);
B29D99/0028 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (EP);
B32B21/14 (EP);
B32B5/02 (EP);
B32B5/08 (EP,US);
B32B5/245 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
F03D1/06 (CN);
B29C70/52 (EP,US);
B29L2031/08 (EP,US);
B32B2260/021 (EP);
B32B2260/023 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (EP);
B32B2262/14 (EP);
B32B2266/0228 (EP);
B32B2603/00 (EP,US);
F05B2230/50 (EP,US);
F05B2240/40 (EP,US);
F05B2280/2001 (EP,US);
F05B2280/2006 (EP,US);
F05B2280/6003 (EP,US);
F05B2280/6013 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2016/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ROTORBLATTKOMPONENTEN FÜR EINE WINDTURBINE | [2016/22] | English: | METHODS OF MANUFACTURING ROTOR BLADE COMPONENTS FOR A WIND TURBINE | [2016/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSANTS DE PALES DE ROTOR POUR UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2016/22] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 14.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/35] | 24.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011135485 (WANG JING [US]) [X] 1-7,9-15 * figures 8-10 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0031] * * claim 6 * [I] 8; | [XI]US2012027609 (OGDE PRASAD [IN], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * figures 6-8, 20-23, 27 * * paragraphs [0027] , [0051] , [0053] , [0063] * [I] 8; | [X]US2012009070 (BECH ANTON [DK]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1, 2, 6 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0027] , [0040] , [0042] , [0070] , [0071] *; | [X]WO2014147222 (HEXCEL HOLDING GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-15 * page 11, lines 25-27 * * page 14, line 18 - line 31 * * page 16, line 29 - line 36 * * page 29, line 8 - line 16 * |