EP3026537 - TOUCH PANEL APPARATUS AND POSITION DETECTION METHOD USING THE TOUCH PANEL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Component Limited 12-4, Higashi-shinagawa 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Kenichi c/o FUJITSU COMPONENT LIMITED 12-4, Higashi-shinagawa 4-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 02 /
MAKIUCHI, Yuji c/o FUJITSU COMPONENT LIMITED 12-4, Higashi-shinagawa 4-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/22] | Schultes, Stephan Haseltine Lake LLP 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 15196103.4 | 24.11.2015 | [2016/22] | Priority number, date | JP20140240426 | 27.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014240426 | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3026537 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3026537 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/045, G06F3/041 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
G06F3/04186 (EP,US);
G06F3/045 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2016/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMVORRICHTUNG UND POSITIONSERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN, DAS DIE BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMVORRICHTUNG VERWENDET | [2016/22] | English: | TOUCH PANEL APPARATUS AND POSITION DETECTION METHOD USING THE TOUCH PANEL APPARATUS | [2016/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PANNEAU TACTILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE POSITION UTILISANT LE DISPOSITIF DE PANNEAU TACTILE | [2016/22] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 01.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2015 | AL | 17.03.2021 | AT | 17.03.2021 | CY | 17.03.2021 | CZ | 17.03.2021 | DK | 17.03.2021 | EE | 17.03.2021 | ES | 17.03.2021 | FI | 17.03.2021 | HR | 17.03.2021 | IT | 17.03.2021 | LT | 17.03.2021 | LV | 17.03.2021 | MC | 17.03.2021 | MK | 17.03.2021 | MT | 17.03.2021 | NL | 17.03.2021 | PL | 17.03.2021 | RO | 17.03.2021 | RS | 17.03.2021 | SE | 17.03.2021 | SI | 17.03.2021 | SK | 17.03.2021 | SM | 17.03.2021 | BG | 17.06.2021 | NO | 17.06.2021 | GR | 18.06.2021 | IS | 17.07.2021 | PT | 19.07.2021 | IE | 24.11.2021 | LU | 24.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.11.2015 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
MK | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 24.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 24.11.2015 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 24.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 24.11.2015 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 24.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 24.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
LU | 24.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
NO | 17.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009322700 (D SOUZA HENRY M [US], et al) [X] 1,3-9 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] * [I] 2; | [I]WO2013027132 (HAPTYC TECHNOLOGY S R L [IT], et al) [I] 1-9 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 23 * * page 6, line 6 - page 8, line 9 *; | [XI]EP2063348 (ASUSTEK COMP INC [TW]) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0033]; figure 2 * [I] 2-7,9; | [XI]JP2012234419 (SHINSEDAI KK) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018]; figure 2b * [I] 2-7,9; | [I]JP2010092332 (YAMAHA CORP) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010309163 (YEH HERNG-MING [TW], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0060] *; | [A]US2012154325 (UENO YUTAKA [JP]) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0158] * | Examination | EP2204726 | by applicant | JP2004272722 | JP2008293129 | JP2009176114 |