EP3038273 - WIRELESS-FIDELITY (WI-FI) BEAMFORMING FOR INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAKOBY, Assi Alterman 21 Herzelia, HA / IL | 02 /
KERNER, Michael Tishrey 7/25 42524 Netanya, M / IL | 03 /
SHAHAF, Shay Bareket 3780700i Beit-Hanania, HA / IL | 04 /
JECHOUX, Bruno 230 Chenim Des Vieux Brusquets 06600 Antibes, 06 / FR | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Lambsdorff & Lange Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Grillparzerstraße 12A 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Patentanwälte Lambsdorff & Lange Dingolfinger Strasse 6 81673 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15196389.9 | 25.11.2015 | [2016/26] | Priority number, date | US201414582997 | 24.12.2014 Original published format: US201414582997 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3038273 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B1/10 (CN);
H04B17/21 (US);
H04B15/00 (US);
H04B7/0634 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIRELESS-FIDELITY (WI-FI)-STRAHLFORMUNG ZUR INTERFERENZUNTERDRÜCKUNG | [2016/26] | English: | WIRELESS-FIDELITY (WI-FI) BEAMFORMING FOR INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION | [2016/26] | French: | FORMATION DE FAISCEAU WI-FI POUR UNE ANNULATION D'INTERFÉRENCE | [2016/26] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 22.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010322176 (CHEN RUNHUA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,13,14 * Equations 2, 3; paragraphs [0023] , [0 52] - [0055] - [0 82] , [00 5] , [0008]; figure 1 * [I] 3-8,10-12,15; | [XA]US2011103287 (MA JIANGLEI [CA], et al) [X] 1,13 * paragraph [0028]; figure 1 * [A] 2-12,14,15; | [XA] - ALCATEL-LUCENT, "UE PMI feedback signalling for user pairing/coordination", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090051_FEEDBACK_SIG_FOR_PREC_V04, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090107), no. Ljubljana; 20090107, XP050318000 [X] 1,13 * Sections 2 and 3 * [A] 2-12,14,15 |