EP3007495 - USING A BLUETOOTH CAPABLE MOBILE PHONE TO ACCESS A REMOTE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbiquity, Inc. 1191 2nd Avenue, Suite 1900 Seattle, WA 98101 / US | [2018/21] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states Airbiquity Inc. 1011 Western Avenue, Suite 600 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARRETT, Darrin 22907 South Kingston Road NE Kingston, WA 98346 / US | 02 /
HONG, Leon 1308 235 H Pl SE Sammamish, WA 98075 / US | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15196576.1 | 05.04.2010 | [2016/15] | Priority number, date | US20090173059P | 27.04.2009 Original published format: US 173059 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3007495 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/52, H04W52/04, H04L29/08, H04M1/725 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04W92/02 (KR);
H04W52/52 (US);
H04B7/24 (KR);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] |
Former [2016/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES BLUETOOTH-FÄHIGEN MOBILTELEFONS FÜR DEN ZUGRIFF AUF EIN ENTFERNTES NETZWERK | [2016/15] | English: | USING A BLUETOOTH CAPABLE MOBILE PHONE TO ACCESS A REMOTE NETWORK | [2016/15] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN TÉLÉPHONE MOBILE BLUETOOTH CAPABLE D'ACCÉDER À UN RÉSEAU DISTANT | [2016/15] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 06.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10714998.1 / EP2425664 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO03081373 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [AD] 1-14 * page 1, line 1 - page 14, line 5 * * page 16, line 15 - page 24, line l ** figures 1-7 * | by applicant | WO03081373 |