EP3026013 - NANOCRYSTALLINE METAL COMPOUND POWDER, METHOD FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANG, Jürgen Erwin Niddastr. 28b 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
RAULEDER, Hartwig Uhlandweg 51A 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | 03 /
UEHLENBRUCK, Goswin Steinstr. 3a 61440 Oberursel / DE | [2016/22] | Application number, filing date | 15196637.1 | 27.11.2015 | [2016/22] | Priority number, date | EP20140195306 | 28.11.2014 Original published format: EP 14195306 | [2016/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3026013 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C01B21/068, C01B31/36 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
C01B21/068 (EP,US);
C01B32/956 (EP,US);
C01B32/963 (EP,US);
C01B32/977 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP);
C01P2004/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NANOKRISTALLINE METALLVERBINDUNGSPULVER, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG ALS AUCH DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2016/22] | English: | NANOCRYSTALLINE METAL COMPOUND POWDER, METHOD FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND USE OF SAME | [2016/22] | French: | POUDRE MÉTALLIQUE COMPOSITE NANO-CRISTALLINE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2016/22] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 10.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0365295 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X] - KIJIMA K ET AL, "SINTERING OF ULTRAFINE SIC POWDERS PREPARED BY PLASMA CVD", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, (19890801), vol. 24, no. 8, ISSN 0022-2461, pages 2929 - 2933, XP000050266 [X] 1-16 * 2. Experimental procedure; page 2929 - page 2930; figure 2 * | [X] - HYUK-SANG PARK, "THERMAL PLASMA CHEMICAL VAPOUR DEPOSITION FOR SIC POWDERS FROM SICH3CI3-H2", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, (19911101), vol. 26, no. 21, doi:10.1007/BF01130141, ISSN 0022-2461, pages 5957 - 5964, XP000249055 [X] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01130141 | [X] - YONG LIANG ET AL, "Laser synthesis of nano powders of Si-based nitrides and carbides", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (19980815), vol. 3550, doi:10.1117/12.317900, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 35 - 42, XP055192361 [X] 1-16 * 1. Introduction 2. Experimental 5. Conclusions;; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.317900 | [X] - VIVET F ET AL, "Synthesis and characterization of SiC:H ultrafine powder generated in an argon-silane-methane low-pressure radio-frequency discharge", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (19980615), vol. 83, no. 12, doi:10.1063/1.367510, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 7474 - 7481, XP012044385 [X] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.367510 | [X] - KEIL D G ET AL, "Combustion synthesis of nanosized SiCxNy powders", MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS (MRS), MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY, PITTSBURG, PA; US, (19960101), vol. 410, ISSN 0272-9172, pages 161 - 166, XP009172433 [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | [X] - ALLAIRE F ET AL, "Production of SiC-Si3N4 composites by a one-step d.c. plasma process", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE LETTERS, CHAPMAN AND HALL LTD. LONDON, GB, (19920101), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.1007/BF00720778, ISSN 0261-8028, pages 48 - 50, XP008176500 [X] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00720778 | by applicant | US2004231583 | US4619905 | - J.A. LELY, "Darstellung von Einkristallen von Siliciumcarbid und Beherrschung von Art und Menge der eingebauten Verunreinigungen", BERICHTE DER DEUTSCHEN KERAMISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT E.V., (195508), pages 229 - 231 | - YONG LIANG; ZHENGANG WU; FEN ZHENG; QUANGGANG XIAN; ZHONGCHAO FENG, "Laser synthesis of nano powders of Si-based nitrides and carbides", PROC. SPIE 3550, LASER PROCESSING OF MATERIALS AND INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS, (19980815), doi:doi:10.1117/12.317900, page 35, XP055192361 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.317900 |