EP3043022 - TURBOMACHINE WITH RING ROOM EXTENSION AND BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [2016/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malzacher, Franz Sonnenweg 12b 82194 Gröbenzell / DE | 02 /
Brettschneider, Markus Schmidhuberstraße 2 80995 München / DE | [2016/28] | Application number, filing date | 15196895.5 | 27.11.2015 | [2016/28] | Priority number, date | DE201410225689 | 12.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014225689 | [2016/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3043022 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3043022 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
F01D5/143 (EP,US);
F01D5/141 (US);
F01D5/02 (US);
F01D5/145 (EP,US);
F01D9/041 (US);
F04D29/284 (US);
F04D29/324 (US);
F04D29/444 (US);
F05D2260/97 (US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] |
Former [2016/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STRÖMUNGSMASCHINE MIT RINGRAUMERWEITERUNG UND SCHAUFEL | [2016/28] | English: | TURBOMACHINE WITH RING ROOM EXTENSION AND BLADE | [2016/28] | French: | TURBOMACHINE À ÉLARGISSEMENT D'ESPACE ANNULAIRE ET AUBE | [2023/24] |
Former [2016/28] | TURBOMACHINE A ELARGISSEMENT D'ESPACE ANNULAIRE ET AUBE | Examination procedure | 27.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 31.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | IT | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | MC | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | LU | 27.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
IT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SK | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
LU | 27.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
LU | 27.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 18.10.2023 | |
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
LU | 27.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 18.10.2023 | |
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 18.10.2023 | |
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 18.10.2023 | |
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1126132 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0041] * * figure - * [I] 3; | [XY]EP1382797 (ROLLS ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0034] * * figure 4 * [Y] 8; | [A]DE102007020025 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0053] ** figure - *; | [XYI]DE102011076804 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0033] * * figure - * [Y] 8 [I] 3,6,7 | by applicant | EP0799973 | EP0943784 |