Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3034864 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2022 | B1 | EP3034864 | 22.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014226126 | 16.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102014226126 | 16.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014226126 | 16.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3034864T | 24.10.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102014226126 | 16.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2929552T | 30.11.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102014226126 | 16.12.2014 |