EP3173455 - CLADDING ELEMENT WITH TEMPERATURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd. Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
François, Nicolas Rue Jean-Jacques Lallemand 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Goulette, Ludivine, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2017/22] | Application number, filing date | 15197047.2 | 30.11.2015 | [2017/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3173455 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09K9/02 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
G02F1/0147 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (US);
B32B15/082 (EP,US);
B32B15/095 (EP,US);
B32B15/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/283 (EP,US);
B32B27/308 (EP,US);
B32B27/40 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B32B9/007 (EP,US);
B32B9/045 (EP,US);
C09K9/02 (EP,US);
G04B45/0015 (EP,US);
G04B47/008 (EP,US);
G04B47/068 (US);
B32B2250/44 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (US);
B32B2307/30 (EP,US);
B32B2307/302 (EP,US);
B32B2307/4026 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/422 (EP,US);
B32B2307/584 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKLEIDUNGSELEMENT MIT TEMPERATURSENSOR | [2017/22] | English: | CLADDING ELEMENT WITH TEMPERATURE SENSOR | [2017/22] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'HABILLAGE AVEC CAPTEUR DE TEMPÉRATURE | [2017/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0102168 (ARRAY DISPLAYS AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,10 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 27 * [I] 2-9,11; | [XI]US5688592 (SHIBAHASHI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 36 - column 9, line 31 * [I] 5-11; | [XI]US2012045952 (CHEN MING-TSE [TW]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * [I] 2-9,11; | [A]US5430692 (GRUPP JOACHIM [CH], et al) [A] 12-18 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 31 * | by applicant | US2008311401 |