EP3176873 - DUAL-POLARIZED PLANAR ULTRA-WIDEBAND ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swisscom AG Alte Tiefenaustrasse 6 Worblaufen/Ittigen 3050 Bern / CH | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jamaly, Nima Swisscom (Schweiz) AG, INI-INO-ECO-MXT Ittigen 3050 Bern / CH | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Mirza, Akram Karim Swisscom (Schweiz) AG GSB-Legal & Regulatory-LST P.O. Box 3050 Bern / CH | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 15197294.0 | 01.12.2015 | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3176873 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/40, H01Q21/28, H01Q1/38, H01Q21/24 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
H01Q9/40 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q1/48 (EP,US);
H01Q21/24 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H01Q9/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DUAL-POLARISIERTE PLANARE ULTRA-BREITBANDANTENNE | [2017/23] | English: | DUAL-POLARIZED PLANAR ULTRA-WIDEBAND ANTENNA | [2017/23] | French: | ANTENNE PLANAIRE À BANDE ULTRALARGE ET DOUBLE POLARISATION | [2017/23] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 19.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6278410 (SOLIMAN EZZELDIN [BE], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 48; figure 1 *; | [YA]WO2009045219 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 4,6,7,12,13 * page 4, paragraph 25 - page 6, paragraph 34; figure 1 * [A] 1-3,5,8-11; | [IY]WO2010029304 (UNIV BIRMINGHAM [GB], et al) [I] 1-3,5,8-11 * page 7, line 29 - page 9, line 16; figures 1, 2 * * page 11, line 22 - page 11, line 29; figure 5 * * page 12, line 12 - page 12, line 14 * * page 13, line 7 - page 13, line 32 * * page 14, line 2 - page 14, line 7; figure 13 * [Y] 4,6,7,12,13; | [A] - MEIE CHEN ET AL, "Compact CPW-fed circular slot antenna for ultra-wideband applications", ANTENNAS, PROPAGATION AND EM THEORY, 2008. ISAPE 2008. 8TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081102), ISBN 978-1-4244-2192-3, pages 78 - 81, XP031398995 [A] 1-13 * section I. and II.; page 78 - page 78; figure 1 * | [A] - REZAUL AZIM ET AL, "Printed circular ring antenna for UWB application", ELECTRICAL AND COMPUTER ENGINEERING (ICECE), 2010 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101218), ISBN 978-1-4244-6277-3, pages 361 - 363, XP031859463 [A] 1,5,12,13 * section I. and II.; page 361 - page 362; figure 1 * | [A] - PRERADOVIC STEVAN, "Novel Dual-Polarized Planar Ultrawideband Monopole Antenna", IEEE ANTENNAS AND WIRELESS PROPAGATION LETTERS, vol. 13, doi:10.1109/LAWP.2014.2320891, ISSN 1536-1225, (20140429), pages 856 - 859, (20140508), XP011547774 [A] 1-3,6,8-13 * section I. and II.; page 856 - page 857; figures 1, 2, 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LAWP.2014.2320891 | by applicant | - S.M. NAVEEN ET AL., "Compact Wideband Rectangular Monopole Antenna for Wireless Applications", WIRELESS ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY, vol. 3, doi:doi:10.4236/wet.2012.34034, (201210), pages 240 - 243, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.4236/wet.2012.34034, XP055273246 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4236/wet.2012.34034 | - R. LECH ET AL., "Coplanar Waveguide Fed Ultra-Wideband Antenna Over the Planar and Cylindrical Surfaces", THE 8TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON ANTENNAS & PROPAGATION, 2014 (EUCAP 2014), HAGUE, NETHERLANDS, (20140406), pages 3737 - 3740 |