EP3023361 - PORTION CAPSULE HAVING AN IDENTIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states K-fee System GmbH Senefelder Strasse 44 51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÜGER, Marc Zaunkönigweg 1 51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waldmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2016/21] | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 15197332.8 | 22.07.2011 | [2016/21] | Priority number, date | DE20101031988 | 22.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010031988 | DE20101044251 | 02.09.2010 Original published format: DE102010044251 | DE20111010534 | 07.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011010534 | [2016/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3023361 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3023361 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/804 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
A47J31/4492 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B65D85/8058 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B65D85/804 (KR,RU);
B65D85/8061 (US);
A47J31/3628 (US);
A47J31/3638 (US);
A47J31/407 (US);
A47J31/44 (KR);
B65D85/8043 (US);
B65D2203/06 (EP,CN,US);
B65D2203/10 (EP,CN,US);
B65D65/466 (EP,US);
Y02W90/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2016/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PORTIONSKAPSEL MIT KENNUNG | [2016/21] | English: | PORTION CAPSULE HAVING AN IDENTIFIER | [2016/21] | French: | CAPSULE DE PORTION AVEC MOYEN D'IDENTIFICATION | [2016/21] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 19.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11740565.4 / EP2595902 | EP15173071.0 / EP2957525 | Divisional application(s) | EP18187301.9 / EP3431415 | EP19165219.7 / EP3521207 | EP19165220.5 / EP3533726 | EP19165223.9 / EP3521208 | EP19165224.7 / EP3521209 | EP19165225.4 / EP3521210 | EP21169325.4 / EP3872001 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.2019
30.09.2019
ADMISSIBLE Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.2019
30.09.2019
ADMISSIBLE Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | 09.10.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.02.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.04.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.05.2021 | 05.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.06.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2011 | AL | 26.12.2018 | CY | 26.12.2018 | CZ | 26.12.2018 | DK | 26.12.2018 | EE | 26.12.2018 | LT | 26.12.2018 | LV | 26.12.2018 | MC | 26.12.2018 | MK | 26.12.2018 | MT | 26.12.2018 | RO | 26.12.2018 | RS | 26.12.2018 | SI | 26.12.2018 | SK | 26.12.2018 | TR | 26.12.2018 | BG | 26.03.2019 | NO | 26.03.2019 | GR | 27.03.2019 | IS | 26.04.2019 | LU | 22.07.2019 | SM | 03.02.2020 | AT | 22.07.2020 | FI | 22.07.2020 | GB | 22.07.2020 | HR | 22.07.2020 | IE | 22.07.2020 | IT | 22.07.2020 | PL | 22.07.2020 | ES | 23.07.2020 | SE | 23.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | FR | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | NL | 01.08.2020 | DE | 02.02.2021 | PT | 24.02.2021 | [2023/38] |
Former [2022/34] | HU | 22.07.2011 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MK | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.02.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 23.07.2020 | ||
SE | 23.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
DE | 02.02.2021 | ||
PT | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/31] | HU | 22.07.2011 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MK | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.02.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 23.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
DE | 02.02.2021 | ||
PT | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | HU | 22.07.2011 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.02.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 23.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
DE | 02.02.2021 | ||
PT | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | HU | 22.07.2011 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.02.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 23.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
DE | 02.02.2021 | ||
PT | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.07.2011 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.02.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 23.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
DE | 02.02.2021 | ||
PT | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.07.2011 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.02.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 23.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
DE | 02.02.2021 | ||
PT | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.02.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 23.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
DE | 02.02.2021 | ||
PT | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.02.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 23.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
DE | 02.02.2021 | ||
PT | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.02.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 23.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.02.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.02.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.02.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | LT | 26.12.2018 | |
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | LT | 26.12.2018 | |
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | LT | 26.12.2018 | |
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 26.12.2018 | |
NO | 26.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2556323 (MUNIER RENE [FR], et al); | [Y]US2002020659 (SWEENEY RICHARD [US], et al); | [Y]WO02078498 (EUGSTER FRISMAG AG [CH], et al); | [Y]DE102006004329 (BRAUN GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP1974638 (TCHIBO GMBH [DE]) | Opposition | EP0468864 | EP0468079 | EP0488452 | EP0514803 | US2003222089 | WO2004065258 | EP1586534 | EP1588845 | WO2007042486 | EP1796516 | US2007157821 | US7444925 | WO2010034663 | EP2384133 |