EP3034300 - MULTILAYER FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Revocation of patent | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Irplast S.p.A. Strada Provinciale Val d'Elsa Zona Industriale Terrafino 50053 Empoli (FI) / IT | [2016/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DI COSTANZO, Carmelo IRPLAST Via Don Minzoni, 26 66034 Lanciano, Chieti / IT | 02 /
PASQUINI, Gino IRPLAST Via Sacchetti 59/A 66030 Treglio, Chieti / IT | 03 /
QUADRINI, Ombretta IRPLAST Via Spaventa, 17 66040 Altino, Chieti / IT | 04 /
SANTILLI, Fausto IRPLAST Via Osservanza Vico III, 4 65028 Tocco Da Casauria Pescara / IT | 05 /
DE IULIIS, Davide IRPLAST Via Alessandro Volta, 6 66034 Lanciano, Chieti / IT | [2018/34] |
Former [2016/25] | 01 /
DI COSTANZO, CARMELO IRPLAST VIA DON MINZONI, 26 66034 LANCIANO, CHIETI / IT | ||
02 /
PASQUINI, GINO IRPLAST VIA SACCHETTI, 59/A 66030 TREGLIO, CHIETI / IT | |||
03 /
QUADRINI, OMBRETTA IRPLAST VIA SPAVENTA, 17 66040 ALTINO, CHIETI / IT | |||
04 /
SANTILLI, FAUSTO IRPLAST VIA OSSERVANZA VICO III, 4 65028 TOCCO DA CASAURIA PESCARA / IT | |||
05 /
DE IULIIS, DAVIDE IRPLAST VIA ALESSANDRO VOLTA, 6 66034 LANCIANO CHIETI / IT | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | Rossetti, Elena BUGNION S.p.A. Via di Corticella 87 40128 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 15197465.6 | 02.12.2015 | [2016/25] | Priority number, date | IT2014MI02184 | 19.12.2014 Original published format: IT MI20142184 | [2016/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3034300 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3034300 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B27/32 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2250/242 (EP);
B32B2307/31 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/516 (EP);
B32B2307/518 (EP);
B32B2307/736 (EP);
B32B2553/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2016/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE FOLIEN | [2016/25] | English: | MULTILAYER FILMS | [2016/25] | French: | FILMS MULTICOUCHES | [2016/25] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 09.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.05.2019
29.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Innovia Films Limited Station Road Wigton Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB Opponent's representative Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | 02
21.05.2019
29.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Treofan Germany GmbH & Co. KG Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Mai Besier European Trademark Attorneys Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 18a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.05.2019
29.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Innovia Films Limited Station Road Wigton Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB Opponent's representative TL Brand & Co 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | ||
02
21.05.2019
29.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Treofan Germany GmbH & Co. KG Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Mai Besier European Trademark Attorneys Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 18a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
Former [2019/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Innovia Films Limited Station Road Wigton Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB Opponent's representative TL Brand & Co 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | ||
02
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Treofan Germany GmbH & Co. KG Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Mai Dörr Besier European Patent Attorneys European Trademark Attorneys Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 64 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | 06.06.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.10.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2020 | 06.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.10.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2015 | AL | 22.08.2018 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | ES | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | HR | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | MK | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | PT | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | RS | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | SM | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | NO | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | IE | 02.12.2018 | LU | 02.12.2018 | MT | 02.12.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PT | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
MT | 02.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
MT | 02.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
MT | 02.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1736309 (AMCOR FLEXIBLES AS [DK]) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [Y]EP2447058 (INNOVIA FILMS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0041]; claims 1-15 *; | [YD]EP2520428 (IRPLAST SPA [IT]) [YD] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4502263 | US4734318 | US4853602 | US4883698 | US5302427 | EP2520428 | Opposition | US5246763 | US5292563 | US5573723 | US6060139 | EP1736309 | WO2011001176 | EP2447058 | EP2520428 | EP0182463 | DE3635928 | US4853602 | EP0645417 | EP0849073 | US5900294 | EP1053278 | EP1055515 | WO0115994 | WO03089336 | US2004048081 | EP1431028 | WO2005007537 | EP1837282 | EP1840029 | WO2009024810 | WO2014087150 | - "TAMFER™ XM-7080, Propylene Based Elastomer", TAMFER Product Sheet, (20111200), XP055379413 | - "Typical Engineering Properties of Polypropylene", INEOS Data Sheet, (20140400), pages 1 - 2, XP055379421 | - "Exact ™ 0203, Ethylene-based Plastomer Resin", ExonMobil Chemical Data Sheet, (20120305), XP055379429 | - Anonymous, "Low-temperature sealing BOPP film reduces bundle wrap costs Direct Bundle Wrap", Wipak E-Magazin 3-06 | - Anonymous, "Capacities shift to the east", Tobaccojournal International, (20070110), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.tobaccojournal.com/Capacities_shift_to_the_east.48231.0.html, XP055381343 | - Huw Kidwell, Stefanie Rossel, "Packaging & Design", Tobacco Journal International, (20070600), page 66, XP055598068 | - Anonymous, "Walothen® CT 25 DW", Wipak Provisional Technical Data, (20080211), XP055414935 | - Anonymous, "Polo BSA L92", POLO Industria e Comercio Ltda, (20070600), XP055382109 | - "Beschreibung der Kunststoffe", Karl Oberbach, Kunststoff-Taschenbuch, 26.Ausgabe, Carl Hanser Verlag Munchen, (19950000), pages 345 - 385, XP055598072 | - Anonymous, "Tafmer™ XM-7070 Propylene Based Elastomer", Tafmer, page 1, XP055414958 | - F. Hensen, "Chapter 8 - Extrusion von Gereckten Folien", F. Hensen, F. Hensen, Handbuch der Kunststoff-Extrusionstechnik, Band 2, Extrusionsanlagen, Carl Hanser Verlag, Munchen, (19860000), pages 243 - 270, XP055341755 | - Anonymous, "TAFMER XM-7080 propylene based elastomer", TAFMER Product Sheet, (20111200), page 1, XP055379413 |