Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10193925 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2019 | B2 | US2016182453 | 23.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201410805460 | 22.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105791219B | Global Dossier | 20.03.2020 | B | CN105791219 | 20.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201410805460 | 22.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3038321 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2018 | B1 | EP3038321 | 29.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201410805460 | 22.12.2014 |