EP3040543 - METHOD TO CONTROL THE TEMPERATURE OF THE EXHAUST GASES OF A SUPERCHARGED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magneti Marelli S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti 61/63 20011 Corbetta (MI) / IT | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAVANNA, Filippo Via Ferrara, 124 40139 BOLOGNA / IT | 02 /
LANZONI, Riccardo Via Tommaso Moro, 19 40026 IMOLA / IT | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Maccagnan, Matteo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2016/27] | Application number, filing date | 15197676.8 | 02.12.2015 | [2016/27] | Priority number, date | IT2014BO00676 | 02.12.2014 Original published format: IT BO20140676 | [2016/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3040543 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3040543 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/14, F02D41/00 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
F02D41/0007 (EP,US);
F01N3/05 (US);
F01N13/10 (US);
F02B37/00 (US);
F02B77/086 (EP,US);
F02D41/1454 (EP,US);
F02D41/1458 (EP,US);
F02D41/18 (EP,US);
F02B25/00 (EP,US);
F02B29/06 (EP,US);
F02D13/0261 (EP,US);
F02D2041/001 (EP,US);
F02D23/00 (EP,US);
F02M26/05 (EP,US);
F02M26/06 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER TEMPERATUR DER ABGASE EINES TURBOVERBRENNUNGSMOTORS | [2016/27] | English: | METHOD TO CONTROL THE TEMPERATURE OF THE EXHAUST GASES OF A SUPERCHARGED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2016/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉGULER LA TEMPÉRATURE DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE SURALIMENTÉ | [2016/27] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 16.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2015 | AL | 29.11.2017 | AT | 29.11.2017 | CY | 29.11.2017 | CZ | 29.11.2017 | DK | 29.11.2017 | EE | 29.11.2017 | ES | 29.11.2017 | FI | 29.11.2017 | HR | 29.11.2017 | LT | 29.11.2017 | LV | 29.11.2017 | MC | 29.11.2017 | MK | 29.11.2017 | NL | 29.11.2017 | PL | 29.11.2017 | PT | 29.11.2017 | RO | 29.11.2017 | RS | 29.11.2017 | SE | 29.11.2017 | SI | 29.11.2017 | SK | 29.11.2017 | SM | 29.11.2017 | TR | 29.11.2017 | IE | 02.12.2017 | LU | 02.12.2017 | MT | 02.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | BG | 28.02.2018 | NO | 28.02.2018 | GR | 01.03.2018 | IS | 29.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 02.12.2015 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 02.12.2015 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 02.12.2015 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.12.2015 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 29.11.2017 | |
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102004038389 (IAV GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0014] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0035] * * claims 1-3 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2009070009 (DELP MATTHIAS [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0003] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0016] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0066] ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP2669497 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0011] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0025] * * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2674595 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0025] - [0044] * * paragraphs [0063] - [0088] * * figures 1,3-9 * |