EP3176108 - PACK FOR AT LEAST ONE CONSUMER ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International S.A. 8, rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDE, Andrew John 14 Willis Road Cambridge CB1 2AQ / GB | 02 /
FARN, Russel Graham 20 St Philip's Road Cambridge CB1 3AQ / GB | 03 /
WILKINS, Rebecca Ann Rose Cottage, Litte Walden Rd Little Walden, Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XA / GB | 04 /
ANDERTON, Alexander Laurence 43 Mulgrave Avenue Preston PR2 1HJ / GB | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15197823.6 | 03.12.2015 | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3176108 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65D50/04, A24F15/12, A24F15/20 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
B65D50/046 (EP,US);
A24F15/01 (EP,US);
A24F15/20 (EP,US);
B65D2215/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG FÜR MINDESTENS EINEN VERBRAUCHERARTIKEL | [2017/23] | English: | PACK FOR AT LEAST ONE CONSUMER ARTICLE | [2017/23] | French: | EMBALLAGE POUR AU MOINS UN ARTICLE DE CONSOMMATION | [2017/23] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002185404 (DONEGAN MICHAEL PATRICK [US]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-5 *[I] 9,11,12; | [XI]WO2009139712 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1,2 * [I] 9,11,12; | [XYI]WO2012053964 (SWEDISH MATCH NORTH EUROPE AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12 * page 7, line 14 - page 18, line 21; figures 1-11 * [Y] 14,15 [I] 9,13; | [Y]CN204120219U (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO) [Y] 14,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2014326623 |