EP3037968 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND FIRMWARE RECOVERY PROGRAM THAT ENSURE RECOVERY OF FIRMWARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Document Solutions Inc. 1-2-28, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-8585 / JP | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kenichiro, Nitta 1-2-28, 1-Chome, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-8585 / JP | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15198216.2 | 07.12.2015 | [2016/26] | Priority number, date | JP20140265435 | 26.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014265435 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3037968 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3037968 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/65, G06F9/4401, G06F11/14 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
G06F9/4401 (EP,CN,US);
G06F11/1402 (CN);
G06F11/2094 (US);
G06F11/1417 (EP,US);
G06F11/1433 (EP,US);
G06F11/1662 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/26] | G06F11/14, G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2016/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND FIRMWARE-WIEDERHERSTELLUNGSPROGRAMM, DIE DIE WIEDERHERSTELLUNG DER FIRMWARE SICHERSTELLEN | [2018/49] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND FIRMWARE RECOVERY PROGRAM THAT ENSURE RECOVERY OF FIRMWARE | [2016/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROGRAMME DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE MICROLOGICIEL QUI ASSURE LA RÉCUPÉRATION DE MICROLOGICIEL | [2016/26] |
Former [2016/26] | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND FIRMWAREWIEDERHERSTELLUNGSPROGRAMM ZUR SICHERSTELLUNG DER WIEDERHERSTELLUNG EINES FIRMWARE | Examination procedure | 07.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2015 | AL | 30.01.2019 | AT | 30.01.2019 | CY | 30.01.2019 | CZ | 30.01.2019 | DK | 30.01.2019 | EE | 30.01.2019 | ES | 30.01.2019 | FI | 30.01.2019 | HR | 30.01.2019 | IT | 30.01.2019 | LT | 30.01.2019 | LV | 30.01.2019 | MC | 30.01.2019 | MK | 30.01.2019 | MT | 30.01.2019 | NL | 30.01.2019 | PL | 30.01.2019 | RO | 30.01.2019 | RS | 30.01.2019 | SE | 30.01.2019 | SI | 30.01.2019 | SK | 30.01.2019 | SM | 30.01.2019 | TR | 30.01.2019 | BG | 30.04.2019 | NO | 30.04.2019 | GR | 01.05.2019 | IS | 30.05.2019 | PT | 30.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 07.12.2015 | |
AL | 30.01.2019 | ||
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
MT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 07.12.2015 | |
AL | 30.01.2019 | ||
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 30.01.2019 | |
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007050675 (YU SHENG-YI [TW]) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] ** paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0020]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2013047031 (TABONE RYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 0011 - page 3, paragraph 0022; figures 1-3 *; | [I]US2014223160 (KIM BYOUNG-CHUL [KR]) [I] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0056]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0086]; figure 5 * |