Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110511689B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2023 | B | CN110511689 | 29.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201910814050 | 22.12.2015 | DE102014119524 | 23.12.2014 | CN201511035958 | 22.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3037493T | 31.08.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15198561 | 09.12.2015 | DE102014119524 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9982168 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2018 | B2 | US2016177138 | 23.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014119524 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105713530B | Global Dossier | 27.09.2019 | B | CN105713530 | 29.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102014119524 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3037493 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2024 | B2 | EP3037493 | 14.03.2018 | B1 | EP3037493 | 29.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014119524 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102014119524 | 23.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014119524 | 23.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2669419T | 25.05.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102014119524 | 23.12.2014 |