EP3032267 - METHODS OF ANALYZING SAMPLE SURFACES USING A SCANNING PROBE MICROSCOPE AND SCANNING PROBE MICROSCOPES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWON, Youngnam c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
PARK, Sungjun c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
PAEK, Woonjung c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
KIM, Seongheon c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
AHN, Jaemin c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
YUN, Dongjin c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15198623.9 | 09.12.2015 | [2016/24] | Priority number, date | KR20140177823 | 10.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140177823 | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3032267 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3032267 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01Q60/42, G01N33/543, C12N11/06 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
G01Q60/42 (EP,US);
G01Q60/26 (KR);
G01Q60/02 (CN);
G01Q20/02 (US);
C12N11/06 (EP,US);
C12Q1/10 (US);
G01B21/30 (KR);
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
G01Q60/24 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | G01Q60/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2016/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON PROBENOBERFLÄCHEN MITTELS RASTERSONDENMIKROSKOP UND RASTERSONDENMIKROSKOPE DAFÜR | [2016/24] | English: | METHODS OF ANALYZING SAMPLE SURFACES USING A SCANNING PROBE MICROSCOPE AND SCANNING PROBE MICROSCOPES THEREFOR | [2016/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'ANALYSE D'UN ÉCHANTILLON DE SURFACES À L'AIDE D'UN MICROSCOPE À SONDE DE BALAYAGE ET LESDITS MICROSCOPES | [2016/24] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 12.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 10.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2006102600 (UNIV FLORIDA [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9 * figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0050] *[A] 6,7,10-14; | [XY]WO2008106469 (UNIV FLORIDA [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-13 * figures 1-5, 18-24 * * page 10, line 6 - page 16, line 22 * * page 29, line 1 - page 33, line 23 * [Y] 10,14; | [Y] - KIDONG PARK ET AL, "'Living cantilever arrays' for characterization of mass of single live cells in fluids", LAB ON A CHIP, (20080101), vol. 8, no. 7, doi:10.1039/b803601b, ISSN 1473-0197, page 1034, XP055124896 [Y] 10,14 * figure 1 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b803601b | [XA] - A. TAUBENBERGER ET AL, "Revealing Early Steps of 2 1 Integrin-mediated Adhesion to Collagen Type I by Using Single-Cell Force Spectroscopy", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF THE CELL, US, (20070501), vol. 18, no. 5, doi:10.1091/mbc.E06-09-0777, ISSN 1059-1524, pages 1634 - 1644, XP055299062 [X] 1-9,11-13 * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [Materials] - paragraph [Results] * [A] 10,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1091/mbc.E06-09-0777 | [XA] - ZHANG XIAOHUI ET AL, "Force spectroscopy of the leukocyte function-associated antigen-1/intercellular adhesion molecule-1 interaction", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, CELL PRESS, US, (20021001), vol. 83, no. 4, ISSN 0006-3495, pages 2270 - 2279, XP002415469 [X] 1-9,11-13 * figure 1 * * paragraph [Materials] - paragraph [Results] * [A] 10,14 | [XA] - "TECH08/05-1 - USING THE CELLHESION MODULE - A PRACTICAL GUIDE", INTERNET CITATION, (2005), URL: http://jpk.com/app-techReports/tech0805-1.pdf, (20070117), XP002415468 [X] 1-5,7-9 * figures 3-5,7-10 * * the whole document * [A] 6,10-14 | [XA] - RICHARD BOWEN W ET AL, "Characterisation of membrane surfaces: direct measurement of biological adhesion using an atomic force microscope", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (19990317), vol. 154, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0376-7388(98)00287-7, ISSN 0376-7388, pages 205 - 212, XP004153961 [X] 1-5,8,9 * figures 1b,3 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [03.2] * * paragraph [0004] * [A] 6,7,10-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0376-7388(98)00287-7 |