EP3035246 - IMAGE RECOGNITION METHOD AND APPARATUS, IMAGE VERIFICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, LEARNING METHOD AND APPARATUS TO RECOGNIZE IMAGE, AND LEARNING METHOD AND APPARATUS TO VERIFY IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Hanseungju Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
SUH, Suhsungjoo Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
HAN, Hanjaejoon Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Choichang Kyu Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 15198654.4 | 09.12.2015 | [2016/25] | Priority number, date | KR20140180213 | 15.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140180213 | KR20150138491 | 01.10.2015 Original published format: KR 20150138491 | [2016/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3035246 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3035246 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/46, G06N3/04, G06K9/62, // G06K9/00 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06F18/2413 (EP,US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06V10/454 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06N3/084 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/25] | G06K9/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] |
Former [2016/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, BILDVERIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, LERNVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG ZU ERKENNUNG EINES BILDES UND LERNVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERIFIZIERUNG EINES BILDES | [2016/25] | English: | IMAGE RECOGNITION METHOD AND APPARATUS, IMAGE VERIFICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, LEARNING METHOD AND APPARATUS TO RECOGNIZE IMAGE, AND LEARNING METHOD AND APPARATUS TO VERIFY IMAGE | [2016/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RECONNAISSANCE D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE VÉRIFICATION D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'APPRENTISSAGE POUR RECONNAÎTRE UNE IMAGE ET PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'APPRENTISSAGE POUR VÉRIFIER UNE IMAGE | [2016/25] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 10.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.06.2024 | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 27.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2016025189 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); |