Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.10.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
04.07.2017 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
12.05.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
09.12.2015 | Change - representative |