EP3178848 - TYPE II ANTI-CD20 ANTIBODY FOR REDUCING FORMATION OF ANTI-DRUG ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.07.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Cueni, Leah Noëmi, et al F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2017/24] | Application number, filing date | 15198715.3 | 09.12.2015 | [2017/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3178848 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, C07K16/30 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
C07K16/2887 (EP);
A61K38/2013 (EP);
A61K39/3955 (EP);
A61K39/39558 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
C07K16/2809 (EP);
C07K16/3007 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
A61K2039/507 (EP);
A61K2039/54 (EP);
A61K2039/545 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/2013, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TYPE II ANTI-CD20 ANTIKÖRPER ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER BILDUNG VON ANTIKÖRPERN GEGEN MEDIKAMENTE | [2017/24] | English: | TYPE II ANTI-CD20 ANTIBODY FOR REDUCING FORMATION OF ANTI-DRUG ANTIBODIES | [2017/24] | French: | ANTICORPS DE TYPE II CONTRE CD20 POUR LA REDUCTION DE LA FORMATION DES ANTICORPS CONTRE DES MÉDICAMENTS | [2017/24] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2017/47] | 13.07.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009134738 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [YD]WO2012107417 (ROCHE GLYCART AG [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2012117002 (ROCHE GLYCART AG [CH], et al); | [XY]WO2015095410 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US4518584 | US4676980 | US4816567 | EP0404097 | US5116943 | WO9301161 | US5206344 | US5208020 | WO9308829 | US5229109 | WO9316185 | WO9411026 | US5416064 | US5500362 | WO9627011 | EP0425235 | US5571894 | US5587458 | US5635483 | US5712374 | US5714586 | US5731168 | US5739116 | US5750373 | US5767285 | US5770429 | US5770701 | US5770710 | US5773001 | US5780588 | US5821337 | WO9850431 | US5869046 | US5877296 | US6075181 | US6150584 | US6248516 | EP1176195 | US2003115614 | US2003124678 | WO03056914 | US2003157108 | US6630579 | WO03084570 | WO03085119 | WO2004024927 | WO2004035607 | US2004093621 | US6737056 | US2004110282 | US2004110704 | WO2004056312 | US2004132140 | WO2004057002 | WO2004063351 | WO2004099249 | WO2004106381 | US2005079574 | WO2005044859 | US2005119455 | WO2005061547 | US6946292 | WO2005100402 | WO2005103081 | US2005266000 | US6982321 | US2006025576 | WO2006029879 | US7041870 | US7087409 | EP1691833 | WO2006121168 | WO2007005874 | US2007036752 | US7189826 | US2007061900 | WO2007031875 | WO2007042261 | US2007117126 | US2007160598 | WO2007110205 | US2007237764 | US2007292936 | EP1870459 | WO2007147901 | US7332581 | US2008069820 | WO2008034473 | WO2008119567 | US2009002360 | US7498298 | US7527791 | WO2009061853 | WO2009080251 | WO2009080252 | WO2009080253 | WO2009080254 | WO2009089004 | WO2009101611 | WO2009114335 | WO2010027827 | US7695936 | WO2010077634 | WO2010129304 | WO2011066342 | WO2011066389 | WO2011090754 | WO2011090762 | WO2011143545 | WO2012058768 | WO2012107417 | WO2012130831 | WO2012146628 | US2013034559 | WO2013026833 | WO2013096291 | WO2013157954 | WO2013157953 | WO2014131712 |