EP3031997 - SYSTEM FOR COVERING OPENINGS ON ROOFS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degen, Alexander 8 Mansfield Street P.O. Box 643 Roselle, New South Wales 2039 / AU | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Lermer, Christoph Nove Haus - Design Offices Luise-Ullrich-Straße 14 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Lermer, Christoph LermerRaible Patent- u. Rechtsanwalts PartGmbB Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15198768.2 | 09.12.2015 | [2016/24] | Priority number, date | DE201410118312 | 10.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014118312 | [2016/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3031997 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3031997 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/147 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
E04D13/1475 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR EINFASSUNG VON ÖFFNUNGEN AUF DÄCHERN | [2016/24] | English: | SYSTEM FOR COVERING OPENINGS ON ROOFS | [2016/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE CHASSIS D'OUVERTURES SUR DES TOITS | [2016/24] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 04.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2305915 (FAKRO PP SPOLKA ZOO [PL]) [X] 1,3-7 * figures 1, 2b, 3b, 4b * [I] 2,15; | [XI]EP0962606 (LAFARGE DAKPRODUKTEN B V [NL]) [X] 1,3-8 * paragraph [0013]; figures 1-3 * [I] 2; | [X]DE2523575 (PRIX HELMUT) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-3 *; | [XI]EP2447438 (FAKRO PP SPOLKA ZOO [PL]) [X] 1,3-7 * figure - * [I] 2,15; | [X]DE7726813U (REINHARD SIGRID) [X] 15 * figure 1 * |