EP3031770 - GRAVITY ACTUATED CRANE STOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manitowoc Crane Companies, LLC 2400 South 44th Street Manitowoc WI 54221-0066 / US | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Ian M. 2400 South 44th Street Manitowoc, WI Wisconsin 54221 / US | 02 /
GEISER, Derrick L. 4922 Remiker Lane Manitowoc, WI Wisconsin 54220 / US | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15199032.2 | 10.12.2015 | [2016/24] | Priority number, date | US201462091213P | 12.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462091213 P | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3031770 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3031770 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/92, B66C23/64 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
B66C23/92 (EP,US);
B66C23/90 (CN);
B66C23/64 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | B66C23/92 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2016/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHWERKRAFTBETÄTIGTER KRANANSCHLAG | [2016/24] | English: | GRAVITY ACTUATED CRANE STOP | [2016/24] | French: | BUTÉE DE GRUE ACTIONNÉE PAR GRAVITÉ | [2016/24] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 26.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2015 | AL | 06.12.2017 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | IT | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | RS | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | IE | 10.12.2017 | LU | 10.12.2017 | MT | 10.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 10.12.2015 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 10.12.2015 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 10.12.2015 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 10.12.2015 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.12.2015 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE927406 (ARDELTWERKE GMBH) [X] 1,5-9,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 5,12; | [A]US2010243595 (WALKER ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]NL1022902C (TECH HANDELSBEDRIJF WOLTMAN B [NL]) [A] 1,9,16 * abstract *; | [A]CN2801750Y (SHANDONG LUNENG GUANGDA HEAVY [CN]) [A] 1,9,16 * figure - *; | [A]EP2253577 (MANITOWOC CRANE COMPANIES LLC [US]) [A] 1,9,16 * abstract * |