Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11040833 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2021 | B2 | US2020262653 | 20.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15199230 | 10.12.2015 | WO2016EP02081 | 09.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108290688B | Global Dossier | 31.05.2019 | B | CN108290688 | 17.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15199230 | 10.12.2015 | WO2016EP02081 | 09.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016365847B | Global Dossier | 09.05.2019 | B2 | AU2016365847 | 12.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15199230 | 10.12.2015 | WO2016EP02081 | 09.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2692292 | 24.06.2019 | C1 | Priority number | Date | EP15199230 | 10.12.2015 | WO2016EP02081 | 09.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017097428 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15199230 | 10.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3178761 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2018 | B1 | EP3178761 | 14.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15199230 | 10.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3178761T | 31.01.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15199230 | 10.12.2015 |