Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10055847 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2018 | B2 | US2017169560 | 15.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15199524 | 11.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101889051B | Global Dossier | 20.08.2018 | B1 | KR20170069937 | 21.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15199524 | 11.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6325643B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2018 | B2 | JP2017188070 | 12.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15199524 | 11.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106874829B | Global Dossier | 26.10.2018 | B | CN106874829 | 20.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15199524 | 11.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3179406 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2017 | B1 | EP3179406 | 14.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15199524 | 11.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI704529B | 11.09.2020 | B | TW201721583 | 16.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15199524 | 11.12.2015 |