Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013070262 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11188908 | 11.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8995361 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2015 | B2 | US2013121263 | 16.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US23016 | 27.01.2012 | US201213366758 | 06.02.2012 | EP11188908 | 11.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6109184B | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | B2 | JP2015502071 | 19.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US23016 | 27.01.2012 | EP11188908 | 11.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2592891 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2016 | B1 | EP2592891 | 15.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11188908 | 11.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3012000 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2019 | C | CA3012000 | 16.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2854623 | 27.01.2012 | EP11188908 | 11.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2854623 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2019 | C | CA2854623 | 16.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US23016 | 27.01.2012 | EP11188908 | 11.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012336325C | Global Dossier | 03.12.2015 | C1 | AU2012336325B | 07.05.2015 | B2 | AU2012336325 | 22.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US23016 | 27.01.2012 | EP11188908 | 11.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3026977 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2020 | B1 | EP3026977 | 01.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15201160 | 11.11.2011 | EP11188908 | 11.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2572453T | 31.05.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP11188908 | 11.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2806074T | 16.02.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15201160 | 11.11.2011 | EP11188908 | 11.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201402102X | 27.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US23016 | 27.01.2012 | EP11188908 | 11.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201403316 | 29.07.2015 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2012US23016 | 27.01.2012 | EP11188908 | 11.11.2011 | Type | Earlier application | EP2592891 |