Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3040106
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.11.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
03.08.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.03.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
02.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.09.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.06.2018 |
First examination report |
|
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.01.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
20.01.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
20.01.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
03.06.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
18.12.2015 |
Change - representative |
|