EP3181150 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analyticon Discovery GmbH Hermannswerder Haus 17 14473 Potsdam / DE | For all designated states B.R.A.I.N. Biotechnology Research And Information Network AG Darmstädter Strasse 34-36 64673 Zwingenberg / DE | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siems, Karsten Feuerbachstraße 7 14552 Michendorf / DE | 02 /
Riedel, Katja Mierendorffstraße 36 64625 Bensheim / DE | 03 /
Krohn, Michael Alexanderstrasse 8 64653 Lorsch / DE | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Fabry, Bernd IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH Schlossstrasse 523-525 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2017/25] | Application number, filing date | 15201444.5 | 19.12.2015 | [2017/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3181150 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/167, A61K31/19, A61K31/192, A61P29/00, A61K9/00 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/381 (EP,US);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/616 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (US);
A61K47/183 (US);
A61K47/26 (US);
A61K47/38 (US);
A61K47/42 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/192, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/19, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] |
Former [2017/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN | [2017/25] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS | [2017/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2017/25] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/14] | 25.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6365634 (RUSSELL BRETT A [US], et al) [Y] 1-12,14,15 * column 19, line 21 - line 23 *; | [XYI]JP2006312590 (SUNSTAR INC) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,12 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034]; examples 7,8 * [Y] 1-12,14,15 [I] 4,6,10,11; | [Y]WO2007040005 (UNIV KYOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12,14,15 * example 3 *; | [Y] - SEPULVEDA ET AL, "Gastroprotective and cytotoxic effect of dehydroabietic acid derivatives", PHARMACOLOGICAL RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, (20051101), vol. 52, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.PHRS.2005.06.004, ISSN 1043-6618, pages 429 - 437, XP005126455 [Y] 1-12,14,15 * Compound 8;; figure 1; table 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.phrs.2005.06.004 | by applicant | US4251195 | EP0389700 | US5286500 | WO0101926 | WO0101927 | WO0101928 | WO0101929 | US6214376 | WO02091849 | EP1064088 | WO03055587 | WO2004050069 | DE102006051529 | - SONG ET AL., JOURNAL OF WOOD CHEMISTRY AND TECHNOLOGY, (1985), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 535 - 542 |