EP3037363 - DEVICE FOR THE SEPARATE CONSERVATION OF A FIRST SUBSTANCE TO BE MIXED WITH A SECOND SUBSTANCE CONTAINED IN A BOTTLE AND FOR CLOSING SAID BOTTLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INGE S.p.A. Via Garibaldi, 190 20024 Garbagnate Milanese / IT | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOBBIO, Alessio Via B. Zenale 13 20123 MILANO / IT | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Di Gennaro, Sergio Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2016/26] | Application number, filing date | 15201621.8 | 21.12.2015 | [2016/26] | Priority number, date | IT2014MI02203 | 22.12.2014 Original published format: IT MI20142203 | [2016/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3037363 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3037363 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/28 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
B65D51/2835 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2016/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR GETRENNTEN AUFBEWAHRUNG EINER ERSTEN SUBSTANZ, DIE ZUM MISCHEN MIT EINER ZWEITEN SUBSTANZ VORGESEHEN IST, DIE IN EINER FLASCHE ENTHALTEN IST, UND ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN DER BESAGTEN FLASCHE | [2016/26] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE SEPARATE CONSERVATION OF A FIRST SUBSTANCE TO BE MIXED WITH A SECOND SUBSTANCE CONTAINED IN A BOTTLE AND FOR CLOSING SAID BOTTLE | [2016/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA CONSERVATION SÉPARÉE D'UNE PREMIÈRE SUBSTANCE À MÉLANGER AVEC UNE SECONDE SUBSTANCE CONTENUE DANS UNE BOUTEILLE ET POUR LA FERMETURE DE LADITE BOUTEILLE | [2016/26] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 08.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 16.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.03.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004113190 (CEDEVITA D O O PREHRAMBENA IND [HR], et al); | [A]DE202009010086U (GENMONT BIOTECH INC SHANHUA [TW]); | [X]WO2012117281 (COSWELL SPA [IT], et al); | [A]US8408389 (ANDERSON MICHAEL R [US]); | [X]WO2014080334 (INGE SPA [IT]) | Examination | US2010288767 | by applicant | IT1252265 |