EP3025664 - SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING AN ELECTROSURGICAL PROCEDURE USING AN ABLATION DEVICE WITH AN INTEGRATED IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICK, Kyle 1170 Merritt Drive Boulder, Colorado 80303 / US | 02 /
STEVEN, Kim 1700 Esberg Road Los Altos, California 94024 / US | 03 /
PRAKASH, Mani N. 1265 Edinboro Drive Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2016/22] | Application number, filing date | 15202131.7 | 27.01.2011 | [2016/22] | Priority number, date | US20100696966 | 29.01.2010 Original published format: US 696966 | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3025664 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
A61B18/1206 (US);
A61B18/18 (US);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B90/37 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1861 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2016/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHEN EINGRIFFS MITHILFE EINER ABLATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT INTEGRIERTER BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/22] | English: | SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING AN ELECTROSURGICAL PROCEDURE USING AN ABLATION DEVICE WITH AN INTEGRATED IMAGING DEVICE | [2016/22] | French: | SYSTÈME D'EXÉCUTION D'UNE PROCÉDURE ÉLECTROCHIRURGICALE À L'AIDE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ABLATION AVEC UN DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE INTÉGRÉ | [2016/22] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 02.02.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11000669.9 / EP2359902 | EP13003544.7 / EP2664358 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6004269 (CROWLEY ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9,10 * column 6, lines 39-49 * * column 17, lines 1-4 * * column 19, line 60 - column 20, line 3 * * column 27, lines 31-62; figures 24, 29, 29a, 53 *; | [X]WO0168173 (BOSTON SCIENT LTD [BB]) [X] 1,2,4,7,9 * page 12, line 11 - page 13, line 25 * * page 15, lines 20-23; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US2009076375 (MASCHKE MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1,5-7,9 * paragraphs [0079] - [0081]; figure 4 *; | [X]US2005096647 (STEINKE TOM A [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0077] , [0 80]; figures 4, 10A, 10E * |