EP3050531 - SELF-SIZING CATHETER FEATURES TO PREVENT OVER-TIGHTENING OF THE ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huszar, Hillary K. 545 Seastorm Drive Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 02 /
Jameson, Allen D. 572 South Taaffe Street Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 03 /
Bagley, Christopher L. 2311 Falling Water Court Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/08] |
Former [2016/31] | 01 /
Huszar, Hillary K. 545 Seastorm Drive Redwood City, CA California 94065 / US | ||
02 /
Jameson, Allen D. 572 South Taaffe Street Sunnyvale, CA California 94086 / US | |||
03 /
Bagley, Christopher L. 2311 Falling Water Court Santa Clara, CA California 95054 / US | Representative(s) | Morgan, Marc Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2016/31] | Application number, filing date | 15202393.3 | 23.12.2015 | [2016/31] | Priority number, date | US201562110835P | 02.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562110835 P | US201514925613 | 28.10.2015 Original published format: US201514925613 | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3050531 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3050531 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B18/12 (CN);
A61B18/00 (CN);
A61B2017/00477 (US);
A61B2018/00214 (CN);
A61B2018/0022 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] |
Former [2016/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTDIMENSIONIERENDE KATHERTERELEMENTE ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON ÜBERSPANNUNG DER ELEKTRODE | [2016/31] | English: | SELF-SIZING CATHETER FEATURES TO PREVENT OVER-TIGHTENING OF THE ELECTRODE | [2016/31] | French: | CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE TAILLE À RÉGLAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE CATHÉTER POUR EMPÊCHER UN SERRAGE EXCESSIF DE L'ÉLECTRODE | [2016/31] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 13.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2015 | AL | 21.02.2018 | AT | 21.02.2018 | CY | 21.02.2018 | CZ | 21.02.2018 | DK | 21.02.2018 | EE | 21.02.2018 | ES | 21.02.2018 | FI | 21.02.2018 | HR | 21.02.2018 | IT | 21.02.2018 | LT | 21.02.2018 | LV | 21.02.2018 | MC | 21.02.2018 | MK | 21.02.2018 | NL | 21.02.2018 | PL | 21.02.2018 | PT | 21.02.2018 | RO | 21.02.2018 | RS | 21.02.2018 | SE | 21.02.2018 | SI | 21.02.2018 | SK | 21.02.2018 | SM | 21.02.2018 | TR | 21.02.2018 | BG | 21.05.2018 | NO | 21.05.2018 | GR | 22.05.2018 | IS | 21.06.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 23.12.2015 | |
AL | 21.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MK | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008319350 (WALLACE MICHAEL P [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0067]; figures 1A-1D *; | [A]US2002065542 (LAX RONALD G [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 6 *; | [A]DE102013104948 (ACANDIS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0070]; figure 11 * |