EP3037517 - PROCESS FOR MODIFYING A CELL BY PUTTING MATERIAL INTO THE CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Femtofab Co., Ltd. Room 716, C5, 77, Cheongam-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Sanghyun Feel harmony 102, 145-33, Chogok-gil Heunghae-eup, Buk-gu, Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 15202518.5 | 23.12.2015 | [2016/26] | Priority number, date | KR20140191302 | 28.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140191302 | KR20150178183 | 14.12.2015 Original published format: KR 20150178183 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3037517 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12M3/06, C12M1/42, C12N15/87, B01L3/00 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
C12M23/16 (EP);
C12M35/02 (EP);
C12M35/04 (EP);
C12N15/87 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] |
Former [2016/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG EINER ZELLE DURCH EINFÜHRUNG EINES MATERIALS IN DIE ZELLE | [2016/26] | English: | PROCESS FOR MODIFYING A CELL BY PUTTING MATERIAL INTO THE CELL | [2016/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MODIFICATION D'UNE CELLULE PAR LA MISE EN PLACE DE MATÉRIAU DANS LA CELLULE | [2016/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 25.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013059343 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11,15 * figures 1a,1b,12,35; example 1; claims 1,27,46 * * page 3, lines 2-10,26 * * page 10, line 19 * * page 65, lines 21-23 * [I] 4,12-14; | [A]WO2005056788 (EXCELLIN LIFE SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1a *; | [A] - A. SHAREI ET AL, "A vector-free microfluidic platform for intracellular delivery", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20130122), vol. 110, no. 6, doi:10.1073/pnas.1218705110, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2082 - 2087, XP055182922 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1218705110 | by applicant | - L. JAMES LEE ET AL., "Nanochannel electroporation delivers precise amounts of biomolecules into living cells", NATURE NANOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 6, (20111016), URL: www.nature.com/naturenanotechnology |