EP3184082 - STENT FOR A SURGICAL VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P+F Products + Features Vertriebs GmbH Wigandgasse 5 1190 Wien / AT | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiss, Katharina Wigandgasse 5 1190 Wien / AT | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/33] |
Former [2017/26] | Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15202542.5 | 23.12.2015 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3184082 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3184082 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP);
A61F2230/0071 (EP);
A61F2250/0039 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] |
Former [2017/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STENT FÜR EIN CHIRURGISCHES VENTIL | [2017/26] | English: | STENT FOR A SURGICAL VALVE | [2017/26] | French: | STENT DESTINÉ À UNE VALVE CHIRURGICALE | [2017/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 04.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2015 | AL | 17.08.2022 | AT | 17.08.2022 | BG | 17.08.2022 | CY | 17.08.2022 | CZ | 17.08.2022 | DK | 17.08.2022 | EE | 17.08.2022 | ES | 17.08.2022 | FI | 17.08.2022 | HR | 17.08.2022 | IT | 17.08.2022 | LT | 17.08.2022 | LV | 17.08.2022 | MC | 17.08.2022 | MK | 17.08.2022 | MT | 17.08.2022 | PL | 17.08.2022 | RO | 17.08.2022 | RS | 17.08.2022 | SE | 17.08.2022 | SI | 17.08.2022 | SK | 17.08.2022 | SM | 17.08.2022 | TR | 17.08.2022 | NO | 17.11.2022 | GR | 18.11.2022 | IS | 17.12.2022 | PT | 19.12.2022 | IE | 23.12.2022 | LU | 23.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 23.12.2015 | |
AL | 17.08.2022 | ||
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
BG | 17.08.2022 | ||
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
IT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
MK | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
TR | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
IE | 23.12.2022 | ||
LU | 23.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 23.12.2015 | |
AL | 17.08.2022 | ||
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
IT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
MK | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
TR | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
IE | 23.12.2022 | ||
LU | 23.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 23.12.2015 | |
AL | 17.08.2022 | ||
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
IT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MK | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
IE | 23.12.2022 | ||
LU | 23.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 23.12.2015 | |
AL | 17.08.2022 | ||
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
IT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
IE | 23.12.2022 | ||
LU | 23.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 23.12.2015 | |
AL | 17.08.2022 | ||
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
IE | 23.12.2022 | ||
LU | 23.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 23.12.2015 | |
AL | 17.08.2022 | ||
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
IE | 23.12.2022 | ||
LU | 23.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
IE | 23.12.2022 | ||
LU | 23.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
IE | 23.12.2022 | ||
LU | 23.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 23.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 23.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 17.08.2022 | |
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007054015 (WEN NING [CN]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | US2008275540 [ ] (WEN NING [CN]) [ ] * paragraphs [0081] - [0083]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2010049313 (ALON DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0089] , [9195]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]US2014249622 (CARMI DORON [FR], et al) [X] 1-14* paragraphs [0121] - [0135]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2014277412 (BÖRTLEIN GEORG [FR], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0083] - [0085]; figures 1-3 * | Examination | US2014343670 |