EP3184380 - PEDAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 107-8556 / JP | For all designated states Hiruta-Kogyo Co., Ltd. 1410, Mobira Kasaoka-shi Okayama 714-0062 / JP | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Motomasa Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Hiroshi Sanno Tec Co., Ltd 3-7, Chuo 2-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0113 / JP | 03 /
ISHII, Junji HIRUTA-KOGYO CO., LTD. 1410, Mobira Kasaoka-shi, Okayama 7140062 / JP | 04 /
NODA, Yoshitaka HIRUTA-KOGYO CO., LTD. 1410, Mobira Kasaoka-shi, Okayama 7140062 / JP | 05 /
FUJIOKA, Kenji HIRUTA-KOGYO CO., LTD. 1410, Mobira Kasaoka-shi, Okayama 7140062 / JP | 06 /
MATSUDA, Takurou HIRUTA-KOGYO CO., LTD. 1410, Mobira Kasaoka-shi, Okayama 7140062 / JP | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | de Arpe Fernandez, Manuel Arpe Patentes y Marcas Edificio Aqua, Calle Agustín de Foxá 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | de Arpe Fernandez, Manuel Arpe Patentes y Marcas, S.L.P. C/Proción, 7 Edif. América II Portal 2, 1° C 28023 Madrid-Aravaca / ES | ||
Former [2017/26] | Arpe Fernandez, Manuel de Guzmán el Bueno, 133 (Edificio Germania) 28003 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 15202584.7 | 23.12.2015 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3184380 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3184380 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/06, G05G1/30 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
B60T7/06 (EP);
B60T11/18 (EP);
G05G1/46 (EP);
G05G1/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Title | German: | PEDALVORRICHTUNG | [2017/26] | English: | PEDAL APPARATUS | [2017/26] | French: | APPAREIL À PÉDALES | [2017/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2016 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 22.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2015 | AL | 29.08.2018 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | ES | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | HR | 29.08.2018 | IT | 29.08.2018 | LT | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | MK | 29.08.2018 | NL | 29.08.2018 | PL | 29.08.2018 | PT | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | RS | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | SM | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | NO | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | IE | 23.12.2018 | LU | 23.12.2018 | MT | 23.12.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PT | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
MT | 23.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
MT | 23.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
MT | 23.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 29.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2012187952 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] *; | [AD]JP2009140230 (HIRUTA KOGYO CO LTD) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [AD]JPS57151150 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC VALVE CO LTD) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS6067272U (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-4 * | Examination | JPS57151150U | JPH04116270U | by applicant | JP2009140230 | JPH04116270 | JPS57151150 |