EP3043298 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USING AN INTERNET OF THINGS NETWORK FOR MANAGING FACTORY PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2016/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATEL, Depti 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-206 / US | 02 /
RENCHER, Robert J. 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 03 /
VINUELAS, Luis A. 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 04 /
FREEMAN, Roland N. 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 05 /
NELSON, David W. 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | [2016/28] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/28] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15202723.1 | 24.12.2015 | [2016/28] | Priority number, date | US201514592289 | 08.01.2015 Original published format: US201514592289 | [2016/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3043298 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (CN);
G05B19/41875 (US);
G05B19/41865 (CN);
G05B2219/32368 (US);
G05B2219/45067 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] |
Former [2016/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES INTERNET-DER-DINGE-NETZWERKS ZUR VERWALTUNG VON WERKSFERTIGUNG | [2016/28] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USING AN INTERNET OF THINGS NETWORK FOR MANAGING FACTORY PRODUCTION | [2016/28] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UN RÉSEAU D'OBJETS CONNECTÉS POUR GÉRER UNE PRODUCTION D'USINE | [2016/28] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 16.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/26] | 17.02.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014354529 (LAUGHLIN BRIAN DALE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0106] *; | [A] - OCKERMAN J J ET AL, "Preliminary investigation of wearable computers for task guidance in aircraft inspection", WEARABLE COMPUTERS, 1998. DIGEST OF PAPERS. SECOND INTERNATIONAL SYMPO SIUM ON PITTSBURGH, PA, USA 19-20 OCT. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19981019), doi:10.1109/ISWC.1998.729527, ISBN 978-0-8186-9074-7, pages 33 - 40, XP032146666 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISWC.1998.729527 |