EP3043150 - HELICOPTER MOTION IDENTIFICATION DURING INERTIAL REFERENCE SYSTEM LEVELING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/28] | HELICOPTER MOTION IDENTIFICATION DURING INERTIAL REFERENCE SYSTEM LEVELING | ||
[2017/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/28] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANGULI, Subhabrata HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2016/28] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2016/28] | Application number, filing date | 15202846.0 | 28.12.2015 | [2016/28] | Priority number, date | US201514590604 | 06.01.2015 Original published format: US201514590604 | [2016/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3043150 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3043150 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B64C19/00, G01C21/18, G01C25/00 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
G01C25/005 (EP,CN,US);
G01C21/18 (US);
B64C19/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/28] | G01C25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Title | German: | HUBSCHRAUBERBEWEGUNGSERKENNUNG WÄHREND DER TRÄGHEITSREFERENZSYSTEMNIVELLIERUNG | [2016/28] | English: | HELICOPTER MOTION IDENTIFICATION DURING INERTIAL REFERENCE SYSTEM LEVELING | [2017/20] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE MOUVEMENT D'HÉLICOPTÈRE LORS DE LA MISE À NIVEAU D'UN SYSTÈME DE RÉFÉRENCE INERTIEL | [2017/35] |
Former [2016/28] | HELICOPTER MOTION IDENTIFICATION DURING INERTIAL REFERENCE SYSTEM LEVELING | ||
Former [2016/28] | CLASSIFICATION DE MOUVEMENT D'HÉLICOPTÈRE LORS DE LA MISE À NIVEAU D'UN SYSTÈME DE RÉFÉRENCE INERTIEL | Examination procedure | 28.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2015 | AL | 14.02.2018 | AT | 14.02.2018 | CY | 14.02.2018 | CZ | 14.02.2018 | DK | 14.02.2018 | EE | 14.02.2018 | ES | 14.02.2018 | FI | 14.02.2018 | HR | 14.02.2018 | IT | 14.02.2018 | LT | 14.02.2018 | LV | 14.02.2018 | MC | 14.02.2018 | MK | 14.02.2018 | NL | 14.02.2018 | PL | 14.02.2018 | PT | 14.02.2018 | RO | 14.02.2018 | RS | 14.02.2018 | SE | 14.02.2018 | SI | 14.02.2018 | SK | 14.02.2018 | SM | 14.02.2018 | TR | 14.02.2018 | BG | 14.05.2018 | NO | 14.05.2018 | GR | 15.05.2018 | IS | 14.06.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 28.12.2015 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MK | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1862764 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0065] - [0078]; figures 3-5 *; | [A]US2011005298 (KERBIQUET ANNE [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0004] , [00 7] , [0 36] , [0 38] , [0 41] * * figure 5 * |