Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
06.02.2020 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.11.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
21.06.2019 | First examination report | |
17.06.2019 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
23.11.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.01.2018 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
05.01.2018 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
05.01.2018 | Change - designated states | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
28.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
20.11.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.06.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] |
22.01.2016 | Change - representative |