EP3069818 - TOOL FOR RETAINING A WORKPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15275069.1 | 18.03.2015 | [2016/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3069818 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q3/08, B23Q3/18, B25B11/00, B23Q17/22 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
B23Q3/088 (EP);
B23Q17/2233 (EP);
B23Q3/18 (EP);
B25B11/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUG ZUM HALTEN EINES WERKSTÜCKS | [2016/38] | English: | TOOL FOR RETAINING A WORKPIECE | [2016/38] | French: | OUTIL DE MAINTIEN D'UNE PIÈCE À USINER | [2016/38] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2017/07] | 09.10.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2003070280 (KATANO RYOICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0073] - [0080] - [0091] - [0092]; figures 1-3 * [A] 3 [I] 11,13; | [X]EP1375057 (BACCI PAOLINO DI BACCI DI AGOS [IT]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0035]; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US2002108238 (OHTA KAZUYA [JP]) [A] 1 * page 15, line 34 - page 16, line 29; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2700487 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * |