EP3106352 - TAMPER-EVIDENT VEHICLE REGISTRATION PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bestplate Limited 16 Great Queen Street Covent Garden London WC2B 5AH / GB | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McNamee, Tony BESTPLATE LIMITED 210 Watson Road Blackpool, Lancashire FY4 3EF / GB | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2016/51] | Application number, filing date | 15275154.1 | 17.06.2015 | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3106352 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/10 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
B60R13/105 (EP);
B60R13/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MANIPULATIONSSICHERES FAHRZEUGNUMMERNSCHILD | [2016/51] | English: | TAMPER-EVIDENT VEHICLE REGISTRATION PLATE | [2016/51] | French: | PLAQUE D'IMMATRICULATION DE VÉHICULE INVIOLABLE | [2016/51] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 28.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1627777 (HOUSE OF PLASTIC LTD [GB]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0047]; figure - *; | [X]DE2829885 (SCHROEDER KARL DR) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 1 - page 9, line l; figure - *; | [X]EP1925505 (HOUSE OF PLASTIC LTD [GB]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0095]; figure - *; | [E]GB2523772 (BESTPLATE LTD [GB]) [E] 1-15 * page 7, line 11 - page 20, line 16; figure - * |