blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3168570

EP3168570 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE PLANARITY OF A METAL PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.05.2018  [2018/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Primetals Technologies France SAS
41, Route de Feurs
42600 Savigneux / FR
[2017/20]
Inventor(s)01 / BOUBY, Sébastien
Primetals Technologies
France SAS
41, Route de Feurs
F-42600 Savigneux / FR
02 / TELLIER, Dominique
Primeteals Technologies
France SAS
41, Route de Feurs
F-42600 Savigneux / FR
03 / TURCHET, Florian
Primetals Technologies
France SAS
41, Route de Feurs
F-42600 Savigneux / FR
 [2017/20]
Representative(s)Metals@Linz
Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH
Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP
Turmstraße 44
4031 Linz / AT
[2017/20]
Application number, filing date15290286.210.11.2015
[2017/20]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3168570
Date:17.05.2017
Language:FR
[2017/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2016
ClassificationIPC:G01B21/30, B21B38/02, G01B5/28
[2017/20]
CPC:
B21B38/02 (EP,RU,US); B21B37/28 (RU); G01B21/30 (EP,RU,US);
G01B5/28 (RU); G01B5/285 (EP,US); G01B7/34 (RU);
B21B2263/04 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:METHODE ZUM MESSEN DER PLANHEIT EINES METALLPRODUKTS, UND ENTSPRECHENDE VORRICHTUNG[2017/20]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE PLANARITY OF A METAL PRODUCT[2017/20]
French:MÉTHODE DE MESURE DE PLANÉITÉ D'UN PRODUIT MÉTALLIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ[2017/20]
Examination procedure18.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/21]
04.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/21]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR1469660  (SUMITOMO METAL IND);
 [I]JPH02207909  (SUMITOMO METAL IND);
 [AD]EP0199543  ;
 [A]US6070472  (KIPPING MATTHIAS [DE], et al);
 [I]EP1249683  (VAI CLECIM [FR]);
 [A]DE102009060243  (SMS SIEMAG AG [DE])
by applicantEP0099543
 EP0199543
 EP0858845
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.