EP3054368 - DIGITAL-DATA MIXING APPARATUS AND DIGITAL-DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paris Sciences et Lettres - Quartier Latin 62bis, rue Gay-Lussac 75005 Paris / FR | For all designated states CNRS (Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique) 3 rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states ESPCI Innov 10 Rue Vauquelin 75005 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Paris Diderot - Paris 7 5, rue Thomas Mann 75013 Paris / FR | [2016/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carron, Igor 60 rue de Richelieu 75002 PARIS / FR | 02 /
Gigan, Sylvain 40 avenue des Gobelins 75013 PARIS / FR | 03 /
Krzakala, Florent 80 avenue Arisitide Briand 92160 ANTONY / FR | 04 /
Daudet, Laurent 71 boulevard Beaumarchais 75003 PARIS / FR | 05 /
Dremeau, Angélique 4 rue de la Guerche 35490 GAHARD / FR | 06 /
Saade, Alaa 1 rue de l'Ecole Polytechnique 75005 PARIS / FR | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15305165.1 | 04.02.2015 | [2016/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3054368 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06E3/00 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
G06E3/005 (EP,US);
H04B10/541 (US);
H04B10/40 (US);
H04B10/61 (US);
H04B10/801 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIGITALDATENMISCHVORRICHTUNG UND DIGITALDATENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2016/32] | English: | DIGITAL-DATA MIXING APPARATUS AND DIGITAL-DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2016/32] | French: | APPAREIL DE MÉLANGE DE DONNÉES ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES NUMÉRIQUES | [2016/32] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02052332 (RISOE NAT LAB [DK], et al) [A] 13,14 * figures 3,5 ** page 23, line 33 - page 24, line 10 *; | [I] - Antoine Liutkus ET AL, "Imaging With Nature: A Universal Analog Compressive Imager Using a Multiply Scattering Medium", arXiv:1309.0425v1 [physics.optics], (20130902), URL: http://arxiv.org/vc/arxiv/papers/1309/1309.0425v1.pdf, (20150605), XP055194020 [I] 1-16 * Second paragraph; page 2 * * page 3; figure 1 * * Fourth paragraph; page 4 * * Section "Results and discussion"; page 5 - page 6 * * Section "Experimental setup"; page 11; figure S1 * * Beginning of section "Virtually sparse intensity inputs"; page 13 * | [I] - POPOFF S M ET AL, "Paper;Controlling light through optical disordered media: transmission matrix approach;Controlling light through optical disordered media: transmission matrix approach", NEW JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20111213), vol. 13, no. 12, doi:10.1088/1367-2630/13/12/123021, ISSN 1367-2630, pages 1 - 26, XP020214666 [I] 1-16 * Last paragraph; page 4 * * Section "Experimental setup"; page 5 * * Two last paragraphs of section 2.3; page 6 - page 7; figure 1 * * page 14 * * Second paragraph; page 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1367-2630/13/12/123021 |