EP3075279 - TRANSPORT BAG FOR MOTORCYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2021 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Softcase 41 bis Boulevard de la Tour-Maubourg 75007 Paris / FR | [2018/11] |
Former [2016/40] | For all designated states Softcase 16 rue du Plateau 75019 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haddad, David 83 bis rue Manin 75019 Paris / FR | 02 /
Schwartzmann, Stephan Charles 37 rue Ernest Cognacq 92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2016/40] | Application number, filing date | 15305491.1 | 02.04.2015 | [2016/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3075279 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A45C7/00 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
A45C7/0022 (EP,US);
B62J50/10 (EP);
B62J9/27 (EP,US);
A45C2009/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPORTBEUTEL FÜR MOTORRAD | [2016/40] | English: | TRANSPORT BAG FOR MOTORCYCLE | [2016/40] | French: | SAC DE TRANSPORT POUR MOTOCYCLE | [2016/40] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 13.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/27] | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.2020 | 30.04.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP4548741B (ISHIGURO HARUKI) [X] 1,2,5,8,9 * abstract * [Y] 4-7,10 [I] 3; | [X]CN2245896Y (HE CAIGEN [CN]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [I]CN203897536U (GUANGDONG WISSBLUE OUTDOOR LEISURE PRODUCTS CO LTD) [I] 1,5,6 * abstract *; | [YA]US2006169690 (ROTHSCHILD WAYNE H [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0121]; figures 1-18 * [A] 1; | [YA]US2012121210 (MEYER MICHAEL J [US], et al) [Y] 5-7,10 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023]; figures 6-8 * [A] 1; | [I]DE102006021551 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [I] 1,11 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032]; figure 3 *; | [A]US5988878 (SIMONETT BERNARD THEODORE [US], et al) [A] 1-3,11 * column 3 - column 4; figures 1,3,21-23 *; | [A]JP2009040087 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,11 * abstract * |