EP3088021 - INFUSION PUMP BASE MODULE WITH PLURALITY OF ATTACHABLE CONTROL MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Vial SAS Le Grand Chemin BP3 38590 Brézins / FR | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Couillaud, Frederic 447 Rue du parc de la Sure 38500 Coublevie / FR | 02 /
Ruton, Stephane 74 Montee des Tupinieres Les hauts de Vienne 35 38200 Vienne / FR | 03 /
Marcoux, Sebastien 764 Avenue Jean Jaures Res le St. Bruno Bat B1 38337 Rives / FR | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Kusche, Robert Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Medical Devices Division Else-Kröner-Straße 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Division Medical Devices Else-Kröner-Straße 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 15305640.3 | 27.04.2015 | [2016/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3088021 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14, // A61M5/145, A61M5/172 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
A61M5/1413 (EP);
A61M2005/1405 (EP);
A61M2205/50 (EP);
A61M2205/502 (EP);
A61M2205/6018 (EP);
A61M2205/70 (EP);
A61M2209/01 (EP);
A61M2209/02 (EP);
A61M2230/005 (EP);
A61M2230/06 (EP);
A61M2230/201 (EP);
A61M2230/30 (EP);
A61M2230/50 (EP);
A61M5/1456 (EP);
A61M5/14566 (EP);
A61M5/1723 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFUSIONSBASISMODUL MIT MEHREREN ANSCHLIESSBAREN KONTROLLMODULEN | [2016/44] | English: | INFUSION PUMP BASE MODULE WITH PLURALITY OF ATTACHABLE CONTROL MODULES | [2016/44] | French: | SYSTÈME ET MODULE DE BASE DE PERFUSION ET PLUSIEURS MODULES DE CONTRÔLE RACCORDABLES | [2016/44] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0154751 (ANEO AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, lines 5-14 * * page 4, line 18 - page 7, line 16 * * page 9, line 10 - page 12, line 26 * * page 13, line 17 - page 18, line 17 *; | [XI]US2007135765 (MILLER CASEY T [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0020] - [0029] - [0031] - [0043] , [0047] , [0049] , [0051] , [0055] , [0057] , [0058] * [I] 11,13,14; | [XI]WO2006083933 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0011] - [0025] , [0063] , [0066] , [0067] , [0120] - [0126] * [I] 3; | [X]US2008009787 (JACOBSEN STEPHEN C [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0010] , [0023] , [0024] , [0036] , [0041] , [0042] , [0044] *; | [X]US7442181 (SCHUBERT ERNST-WILHELM [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003106553 (VANDERVEEN TIMOTHY W [US]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [I]US2010160861 (CAUSEY III JAMES D [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0019] , [0020] , [0026] , [0060] - [0062] - [0079] - [0087] - [0092] , [0093] * | by applicant | DE10335236 |