EP3098735 - QUERYING A DATABASE WITH THICKNESS CRITERION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dassault Systèmes 10, rue Marcel Dassault 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [2016/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marini, Laurent 75 bis rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | 02 /
Rorato, Rémy 8 rue du commandant René Mouchotte A203 75014 Paris / FR | 03 /
Rameau, Jean-François 36 rue Agrippa d'Aubigné 91090 Lisses / FR | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | Bandpay & Greuter 30 rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15305809.4 | 28.05.2015 | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3098735 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50, G06F17/30 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
G06F16/248 (EP,US);
G06F16/24 (EP,US);
G06F16/24573 (EP,US);
G06F16/5854 (CN);
G06F30/00 (US);
G06F30/17 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2016/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABFRAGE EINER DATENBANK MIT DICKENKRITERIUM | [2016/48] | English: | QUERYING A DATABASE WITH THICKNESS CRITERION | [2016/48] | French: | INTERROGATION D'UNE BASE DE DONNEES AVEC CRITERE D'EPAISSEUR | [2016/48] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 15.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/16] | 29.10.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.03.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/16] | Appeal following examination | 30.12.2019 | Appeal received No. T0785/20 | 09.03.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.03.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | EP2169567 |