EP3103474 - LIVE RECOMBINANT MEASLES-M2 VIRUS AND ITS USE IN ELICITING IMMUNITY AGAINST INFLUENZA VIRUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [2017/20] |
Former [2016/50] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Escriou, Nicolas, Robert, Xavier 201, rue d'Alésia 75014 PARIS / FR | 02 /
Tangy, Frédéric 60, rue du Garde Chasse 93260 LES LILAS / FR | 03 /
Vo, Ho Hong Hai 143, avenue de Verdun 94200 IVRY SUR SEINE / FR | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud SAS 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [2016/50] | Application number, filing date | 15305918.3 | 12.06.2015 | [2016/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3103474 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/145, A61K39/165, C07K14/11 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/145 (US);
A61K2039/5256 (US);
A61K2039/5258 (US);
A61K2039/55 (US);
A61K2039/70 (US);
C12N2760/16122 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16123 (US);
C12N2760/16134 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEBENDES REKOMBINANTES MASERN-M2-VIRUS UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG BEI AUSLÖSUNG VON IMMUNITÄT GEGEN INFLUENZAVIREN | [2016/50] | English: | LIVE RECOMBINANT MEASLES-M2 VIRUS AND ITS USE IN ELICITING IMMUNITY AGAINST INFLUENZA VIRUSES | [2016/50] | French: | VIRUS MEASLES-M2 RECOMBINANT VIVANT ET SON UTILISATION POUR PROVOQUER UNE IMMUNITÉ CONTRE DES VIRUS DE LA GRIPPE | [2016/50] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 15.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/50] | 24.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03022204 (UNIV EAST CAROLINA [US], et al) [A] 1* page 2, line 5 - line 16 *; | [Y]WO2004001051 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-20 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph l - page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 29 - page 51; example 1 * * page 54 * * page 56 - page 57 *; | [YD] - DENG LEI ET AL, "M2e-Based Universal Influenza A Vaccines.", VACCINES 2015, (20150213), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 2076-393X, pages 105 - 136, XP002751553 [YD] 1-20 * page 114 - page 115 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/vaccines3010105 | by applicant | WO2004000876 | - ARIMORI, Y.; NAKAMURA, R.; YAMADA, H.; SHIBATA, K.; MAEDA, N.; KASE, T.; YOSHIKAI, Y., "Type I interferon limits influenza virus-induced acute lung injury by regulation of excessive inflammation in mice", ANTIVIRAL RES, (2013), vol. 99, pages 230 - 237 | - BANKAMP B ET AL., "Genetic characterization of Measles Vaccine Strains", THE JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (2011), vol. 204, pages S533 - S548 | - DENG L. ET AL., VACCINES, (2015), vol. 3, pages 105 - 136 | - BAO, Y.; BOLOTOV, P.; DERNOVOY, D.; KIRYUTIN, B.; ZASLAVSKY, L.; TATUSOVA, T.; OSTELL, J.; LIPMAN, D., "The influenza virus resource at the National Center for Biotechnology Information", J VIROL, (2008), vol. 82, pages 596 - 601 | - CALAIN, P.; ROUX, L., "The rule of six, a basic feature for efficient replication of Sendai virus defective interfering RNA", J VIROL, (1993), vol. 67, pages 4822 - 4830 | - COMBREDET, C.; LABROUSSE, V.; MOLLET, L.; LORIN, C.; DELEBECQUE, F.; HURTREL, B.; MCCLURE, H.; FEINBERG, M.B.; BRAHIC, M.; TANGY,, "A molecularly cloned Schwarz strain of measles virus vaccine induces strong immune responses in macaques and transgenic mice", J VIROL, (2003), vol. 77, pages 11546 - 11554 | - EI BAKKOURI, K.; DESCAMPS, F.; DE FILETTE, M.; SMET, A.; FESTJENS, E.; BIRKETT, A.; VAN ROOIJEN, N.; VERBEEK, S.; FIERS, W.; SAELE, "Universal vaccine based on ectodomain of matrix protein 2 of influenza A: Fc receptors and alveolar macrophages mediate protection", J IMMUNOL, (2011), vol. 186, pages 1022 - 1031 | - HOFFMANN, E.; KRAUSS, S.; PEREZ, D.; WEBBY, R.; WEBSTER, R.G., "Eight-plasmid system for rapid generation of influenza virus vaccines", VACCINE, (2002), vol. 20, pages 3165 - 3170 | - ILYINSKII, P.O.; GABAI, V.L.; SUNYAEV, S.R.; THOIDIS, G.; SHNEIDER, A.M., "Toxicity of influenza A virus matrix protein 2 for mammalian cells is associated with its intrinsic proton-channeling activity", CELL CYCLE, (2007), vol. 6, pages 2043 - 2047 | - JEGERLEHNER, A.; SCHMITZ, N.; STORNI, T.; BACHMANN, M.F., "Influenza A vaccine based on the extracellular domain of M2: weak protection mediated via antibody-dependent NK cell activity", J IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 172, pages 5598 - 5605 | - MARCEL JONGES ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (201003), vol. 48, no. 3, pages 928 - 940 | - MISPLON, J.A.; LO, C.Y.; GABBARD, J.D.; TOMPKINS, S.M.; EPSTEIN, S.L., "Genetic control of immune responses to influenza A matrix 2 protein (M2", VACCINE, (2010), vol. 28, pages 5817 - 5827 | - MRKIC, B.; PAVLOVIC, J.; RULICKE, T.; VOLPE, P.; BUCHHOLZ, C.J.; HOURCADE, D.; ATKINSON, J.P.; AGUZZI, A.; CATTANEO, R., "Measles virus spread and pathogenesis in genetically modified mice", J VIROL, (1998), vol. 72, pages 7420 - 7427 | - PLUMET, S.; DUPREX, W.P.; GERLIER, D., "Dynamics of viral RNA synthesis during measles virus infection", J VIROL, (2005), vol. 79, pages 6900 - 6908 | - RAMISSE, F.; DERAMOUDT, F.X.; SZATANIK, M.; BIANCHI, A.; BINDER, P.; HANNOUN, C.; ALONSO, J.M., "Effective prophylaxis of influenza A virus pneumonia in mice by topical passive immunotherapy with polyvalent human immunoglobulins or F(ab')2 fragments", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 111, pages 583 - 587 | - REED, L.J.; MUENCH, H., "A simple method of estimating fifty percent endpoints", AM. J. HYG, (1938), vol. 27, pages 493 - 497 | - RIMA, B.K., "The proteins of morbilliviruses", J GEN VIROL, (1983), vol. 64, pages 1205 - 1219 | - SCHNEIDER, H.; KAELIN, K.; BILLETER, M.A., "Recombinant measles viruses defective for RNA editing and V protein synthesis are viable in cultured cells", VIROLOGY, (1997), vol. 227, pages 314 - 322 | - WOLF, A.I.; MOZDZANOWSKA, K.; WILLIAMS, K.L.; SINGER, D.; RICHTER, M.; HOFFMANN, R.; CATON, A.J.; OTVOS, L.; ERIKSON, J., "Vaccination with M2e-based multiple antigenic peptides: characterization of the B cell response and protection efficacy in inbred and outbred mice", PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, page E28445 | - ZHANG, S.; CHEN, L.; ZHANG, G.; YAN, Q.; YANG, X.; DING, B.; TANG, Q.; SUN, S.; HU, Z.; CHEN, M., "An amino acid of human parainfluenza virus type 3 nucleoprotein is critical for template function and cytoplasmic inclusion body formation", J VIROL, (2013), vol. 87, pages 12457 - 12470 |