EP3108889 - DROSPIRENONE-BASED CONTRACEPTIVE FOR A FEMALE PATIENT AFFECTED WITH EXCESS WEIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratorios Leon Farma SA c/ La Vallina s/n - Poligono Industrial Navatejera Villaquilambre 24008 Leon / ES | [2017/24] |
Former [2016/52] | For all designated states Perrin, Philippe 10 rue Docteur Roux 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Laboratorios Leon Farma SA c/ La Vallina s/n - Poligono Industrial Navatejera Villaquilambre 24008 Leon / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERRIN, Philippe 10 rue du Docteur Roux 75015 PARIS / FR | 02 /
DROUIN, Dominique 32 rue des Gatines 91370 VERRIERES / FR | 03 /
BOYER-JOUBERT, Cécile 50 rue Maurice Philippot 92260 FONTENAY AUX ROSES / FR | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15305965.4 | 23.06.2015 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3108889 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/585, A61P15/18 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
A61K31/585 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DROSPIRENONBASIERTES VERHÜTUNGSMITTEL FÜR EINEN WEIBLICHEN ÜBERGEWICHTIGEN PATIENTEN | [2016/52] | English: | DROSPIRENONE-BASED CONTRACEPTIVE FOR A FEMALE PATIENT AFFECTED WITH EXCESS WEIGHT | [2016/52] | French: | CONTRACEPTIF À BASE DE DROSPIRENONE POUR UN PATIENT FÉMININ AYANT UN EXCÈS DE POIDS | [2016/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 08.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO2012000981 (LEON FARMA SA LAB [ES], et al) [XD] 1-12 * the whole document * * page 10, line 29 * * examples 1-5 * * page 22, line 20 - page 27, line 35; claims 1-16 *; | [A] - DINGER J C ET AL, "Oral contraceptive effectiveness according to body mass index, weight, age, and other factors", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF OBSTETRICS & GYNECOLOGY, MOSBY, ST LOUIS, MO, US, vol. 201, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.AJOG.2009.03.017, ISSN 0002-9378, (20090901), pages 263.e1 - 263.e9, (20090530), XP026557648 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajog.2009.03.017 | [A] - BLANCO-MOLINA M A ET AL, "Progestin-only contraception and venous thromboembolism", THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, TARRYTOWN, NY, US, vol. 129, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.THROMRES.2012.02.042, ISSN 0049-3848, (20120222), pages e257 - e262, (20120229), XP028419802 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.thromres.2012.02.042 | by applicant | US4129564 | WO9806738 | WO2006061309 | EP1746101 | WO2012000981 | - FLEGAL ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, (2012), vol. 307, no. 5, pages 491 - 97 | - SEDGH G. ET AL., STUDIES IN FAMILY PLANNING, (2014), vol. 45, no. 3, pages 301 - 314 | - CEDERGREN MI, OBSTET. GYNECOL., (2004), vol. 103, pages 219 - 24 | - BLANCO-MOLINA MA ET AL., "Progestin-only contraception and venous thromboembolism", THROMBOSIS RESEARCH., (2012), vol. 129, pages E257 - E262 | - ABDOLLAHI M. ET AL., THROMB. HAEMOST., (2003), vol. 89, no. 3, pages 493 - 498 | - MURTHY AS., SEMIN REPROD MED., (201003), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 156 - 63 | - POMP ER ET AL., BR J HAEMATOL, (2007), vol. 139, pages 289 - 296 | - "US medical eligibility criteria for contraceptive use", MMWR Early Release, (2010), vol. 59, pages 1 - 86 | - MANTHA S ET AL., BMJ, (2012), vol. 345, page E4944 | - LIDEGAARD O. ET AL., BMJ, (2011), vol. 343, page D6423 | - ROSENBERG MJ ET AL., J REPROD. MED., (1995), vol. 40, no. 5, pages 355 - 360 | - HAMPTON RM ET AL., CONTRACEPTION, (2008), vol. 77, no. 6, pages 415 - 419 | - DRAGOMAN M. ET AL., CONTRACEPTION, (201304), vol. 87, no. 4, pages 432 - 436 | - HAREL Z ET AL., "Adolescents' reasons for and experience after discontinuation of the long-acting contraceptives Depo-Provera and Norplant", J ADOLESC HEALTH, (1996), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 118 - 23 | - KAUNITZ AM, "Injectable depot medroxyprogesterone acetate contraception: an update for U.S. clinicians", INT J FERTIL WOMENS MED, (1998), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 73 - 83 | - KEDER LM ET AL., "Compliance with depot medroxyprogesterone acetate: a randomized, controlled trial of intensive reminders", AM J OBSTET GYNECOL, (1998), vol. 179, pages 583 - 5 | - FRASER IS ET AL., "Depo-Provera use in an Australian metropolitan practice", MED J AUSTRALIA, (1994), vol. 160, no. 9, pages 553 - 6 | - NUTLEY T ET AL., "Treatment of bleeding problems associated with progestin-only contraceptives: survey results.", ADV CONTRACEPT, (1997), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 419 - 28 | - HILL DA., "Gynecology case challenge: vaginal bleeding in a woman taking an injectable contraceptive", MEDSCAPE WOMENS HEALTH, (1998), vol. 3, no. 1, page 4 | - CONNOR ET AL., J. AM. BORAD FAM. PRACT., (2002), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 7 - 10 | - CASEY ET AL., CONTRACEPTION, (2013), vol. 87, pages 370 - 374 | - CURTIS KM. ET AL., "Progestogen-only contraceptive use in obese women", CONTRACEPTION, (2009), vol. 80, no. 4, pages 346 - 354 | - ROSENBERG M., "Weight change with oral contraceptive use and during the menstrual cycle: results of daily measurements", CONTRACEPTION, (1998), vol. 58, pages 345 - 9 | - KIR ET AL., RAPID COMMUNICATION IN MASS SPECTROMETRY, (2006), vol. 20, pages 1247 - 1252 | - ROSENBAUM ET AL., THE EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CONTRACEPTION AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH CARE, (2000), vol. 5, pages 16 - 24 | - SHIGETOH ET AL., AM. J. HYPERTENSION, (200902), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 151 - 155 |