EP3112922 - A GAZE TRACKING DEVICE AND A HEAD MOUNTED DEVICE EMBEDDING SAID GAZE TRACKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2019/10] |
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORÉ, Renaud TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 CESSON-SÉVIGNÉ / FR | 02 /
GALPIN, Franck TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 CESSON-SÉVIGNÉ / FR | 03 /
VANDAME, Benoît TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 CESSON-SÉVIGNÉ / FR | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Uhlig, Thomas Rittner & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Schiffgraben 17 30159 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 15306047.0 | 30.06.2015 | [2017/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3112922 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, A61B3/113, G06F3/01, G02B27/00 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
G02B27/0075 (EP);
G06F3/013 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/0093 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06V40/19 (US);
A61B3/113 (EP,US);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G02B27/0172 (EP,US);
G02B27/0176 (US);
G02B27/0179 (CN);
G02B5/30 (EP,US);
H04N23/20 (EP,CN,KR);
H04N23/81 (KR);
H04N5/33 (US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0187 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/957 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] |
Former [2017/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLICKVERFOLGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND KOPFMONTIERTE VORRICHTUNG MIT EINGEBETTETER BLICKVERFOLGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/01] | English: | A GAZE TRACKING DEVICE AND A HEAD MOUNTED DEVICE EMBEDDING SAID GAZE TRACKING DEVICE | [2017/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POURSUITE DU REGARD ET DISPOSITIF MONTÉ SUR LA TÊTE INTÉGRANT CE DISPOSITIF DE POURSUITE DU REGARD | [2017/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 17.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/21] | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011170061 (GORDON GARY B [US]); | [XI]US2013114850 (PUBLICOVER NELSON G [US], et al); | [A]WO2014186620 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]); | [XI]US2015061995 (GUSTAFSSON SIMON [SE], et al); | [XI]US2015098620 (WU BO [US], et al); | [XI]EP2886041 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) | by applicant | WO2013167864 |