EP3168611 - CORROSION OR SCALE INHIBITOR DOSAGE IN INDUSTRIAL WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TotalEnergies OneTech La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states TOTAL SE La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [2017/20] | For all designated states Total SA 2 place Jean Millier La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moulie, Grégory Res. les allées de Vigny App. A404 391 bd du Cami Salié 64000 Pau / FR | 02 /
Gleyzes, Christine 31 avenue du Tonkin 64410 Billere / FR | 03 /
Cugnet, Cyril 47 rue Carnot 64000 PAU / FR | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2017/20] | Application number, filing date | 15306794.7 | 12.11.2015 | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3168611 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/48, G01N17/02, G01N33/18 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
G01N17/02 (EP);
G01N27/48 (EP);
G01N33/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] |
Former [2017/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KORROSION- ODER KESSELSTEINVERHÜTERDOSIERUNG IN BRAUCHWASSER | [2017/20] | English: | CORROSION OR SCALE INHIBITOR DOSAGE IN INDUSTRIAL WATER | [2017/20] | French: | DOSAGE D'UN INHIBITEUR DE CORROSION OU D'ENTARTRAGE DANS L'EAU INDUSTRIELLE | [2017/20] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 17.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/12] | 05.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2018 | 30.11.2022 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010147707 (LIU JIANYUN [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,7,12 * paragraphs [0004] , [ 0012] , [ 0015] , [ 0016] , [ 0023] , [ 0026] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 4,5,10,13 [I] 6,8,9,14; | [XYI]US2007039833 (LIN CHIH-PEN [TW], et al) [X] 1-3,7,12 * paragraphs [0004] , [ 0008] - paragraph [0021]; figure 1 * [Y] 15 [I] 6,9; | [Y]WO9732203 (EA TECH LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 4,5,10,13,15 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 10 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 16; figures 2-5 * * page 9, line 17 - line 34 *; | [XI]EP0739485 (BUCKMAN LABOR INC [US]) [X] 1,3,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0002] , [ 0008] , [ 0026] , [ 0034] , [ 0037]; figure 1 * [I] 13; | [X]EP2775297 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0004] , [ 0005] , [ 0011] , [ 0014] , [ 0016] , [ 0036] - paragraph [0047]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0063] *; | [A]US2012160707 (KUSINSKI GRZEGORZ JAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2015092310 | US7057050 | - OLIVIER ZAOUAK ET AL., "Electroanalytical Device for Cadmium Speciation in Waters. Part 1: Development and Characterization of a Reliable Screen-Printed Sensor", ELECTROANALYSIS, (2010), vol. 22, no. 11, pages 1151 - 1158 |